EP0345091 - Ferroelectric liquid crystal compositions [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.10.1994 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.10.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.11.1994 [1994/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Chisso Corporation 6-32, Nakanoshima 3-chome Kita-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 530-0055 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1989/49] | For all designated states Chisso Corporation 6-32, Nakanoshima 3-chome Kita-ku Osaka-shi Osaka-fu / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Takeshita, Fusayuki 17 Tatsumidai-Higashi 2-chome Ichihara-shi Chiba-ken / JP | 02 /
Kikuchi, Makoto 1708-7 Jousai Kisarazu-shi Chiba-ken / JP | 03 /
Ichihashi, Mitsuyoshi 17 Tatsumidai-Higashi 2-chome Ichihara-shi Chiba-ken / JP | 04 /
Terashima, Kanetsugu 8890, Goi Ichihara-shi Chiba-ken / JP | 05 /
Furukawa, Kenji 8890, Goi Ichihara-shi Chiba-ken / JP | [1989/49] | Representative(s) | Lamb, John Baxter, et al Marks & Clerk 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1989/49] | Lamb, John Baxter, et al MARKS & CLERK, 57-60 Lincoln's Inn Fields London WC2A 3LS / GB | Application number, filing date | 89305606.9 | 02.06.1989 | [1989/49] | Priority number, date | JP19880136798 | 03.06.1988 Original published format: JP 13679888 | [1989/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0345091 | Date: | 06.12.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/49] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0345091 | Date: | 13.03.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0345091 | Date: | 01.12.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.01.1991 | Classification | IPC: | C09K19/34, C09K19/42, C09K19/46 | [1989/49] | CPC: |
C09K19/46 (EP,KR,US);
C09K19/34 (KR);
C09K19/3455 (EP,US);
C09K19/42 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, SE [1989/49] | Title | German: | Ferroelektrische Flüssigkristallzusammensetzungen | [1989/49] | English: | Ferroelectric liquid crystal compositions | [1989/49] | French: | Compositions liquides cristallines ferro-électriques | [1989/49] | Examination procedure | 17.05.1991 | Examination requested [1991/29] | 23.06.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.12.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.02.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 27.05.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.08.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 05.08.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.09.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.06.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.06.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.06.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0260910 (CHISSO CORP [JP]); | [X]EP0260153 (CHISSO CORP [JP]); | [YP]EP0318028 (CHISSO CORP [JP]); | [Y]EP0269062 (CHISSO CORP [JP]); | [X]EP0257457 (CHISSO CORP [JP]) |