EP0345094 - Polyphenylene sulfide composition [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.05.1996 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.05.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.07.1996 [1996/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TORAY INDUSTRIES, INC. 2-1, Nihonbashi Muromachi 2-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 103 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1989/49] | For all designated states TORAY INDUSTRIES, INC. 2-1, Nihonbashi Muromachi 2-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kadoi, Sho Toray Shataku 141 1 Yushudai Higashi 3-chome Ichihara-shi Chiba / JP | 02 /
Shimasaki, Norio 2 Mizusato 2-chome Nakagawa-ku Nagoya-shi Aichi / JP | [1989/49] | Representative(s) | Geering, Keith Edwin, et al Reddie & Grose 16 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1989/49] | Geering, Keith Edwin, et al REDDIE & GROSE 16 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 89305611.9 | 02.06.1989 | [1989/49] | Priority number, date | JP19880136288 | 02.06.1988 Original published format: JP 13628888 | [1989/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0345094 | Date: | 06.12.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0345094 | Date: | 26.07.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.09.1989 | Classification | IPC: | C08L81/02, C08L23/00 | [1989/49] | CPC: |
C08L63/00 (EP);
C08L81/02 (EP);
C08L81/04 (KR);
C08L23/00 (EP);
C08L23/02 (EP);
C08L53/02 (EP);
C08L77/00 (EP)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C08L63/00, C08L2666/02 (EP);
C08L63/00, C08L2666/04 (EP);
C08L63/00, C08L81/00 (EP);
C08L81/02, C08L2666/04 (EP); | Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [1989/49] | Title | German: | Polyphenylensulfidzusammensetzung | [1989/49] | English: | Polyphenylene sulfide composition | [1989/49] | French: | Composition de poly(sulfure de phénylène) | [1989/49] | Examination procedure | 28.03.1990 | Examination requested [1990/22] | 18.12.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.04.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.11.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.04.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.10.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 30.01.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.04.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 13.04.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.04.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.06.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.06.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.06.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.06.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 01.05.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP59113055 ; | [X]JP6153356 | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 8, no. 232 (C-248)[1669], 25th October 1984; & JP-A-59 113 055 (DAINIPPON INK KAGAKU KOGYO K.K.) 29-06-1984, & JP59113055 A 00000000 | [X] - WPIL, FILE SUPPLIER, abstract no. AN=86-110414, Derwent Publications Ltd, London, GB; & JP-A-61 53 356 (DAINIPPON INK) 17-03-1986, & JP6153356 A 00000000 | by applicant | US4421910 | US4434122 | US4411853 | US3413323 | JPS60120753 | JPS59113055 | JPS5827740 | JPS56118456 | JPS56118449 | US3354129 | US3919177 |