EP0348061 - Stereolithographic Process for Preparing Prosthetic Devices [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1989/52] | Prosthetic devices | ||
[1995/43] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.08.1996 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.10.1996 [1996/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Zeneca Limited 15 Stanhope Gate London W1Y 6LN / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1993/46] | For all designated states ZENECA LIMITED 15 Stanhope Gate London W1Y 6LN / GB | ||
Former [1989/52] | For all designated states IMPERIAL CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES PLC Imperial Chemical House, Millbank London SW1P 3JF / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Jones, Michael Edward Benet 40 Marbury Road Viscars Cross Chester / GB | 02 /
Thomas, Ieuan 50 Springbourne Frodsham Cheshire WA6 6QD / GB | [1995/43] |
Former [1989/52] | 01 /
Jones, Michael Edward Benet 40 Marbury Road Viscars Cross Chester / US | ||
02 /
Thomas, Ieuan 50 Springbourne Frodsham Cheshire WA6 6QD / US | Representative(s) | Stephenson, Kenneth, et al Intellectual Property Group ZENECA Specialties P.O. Box 42 Hexagon House Blackley Manchester M9 8ZS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1995/43] | Stephenson, Kenneth, et al Intellectual Property Group ZENECA Specialties P.O. Box 42 Hexagon House Blackley Manchester M9 8ZS / GB | ||
Former [1993/46] | Stephenson, Kenneth ICI Group Patents Services Dept. PO Box 6 Shire Park Bessemer Road Welwyn Garden City, Herts, AL7 1HD / GB | ||
Former [1989/52] | Thomas, Ieuan Intellectual Property Department ICI Chemicals & Polymers Ltd P.O. Box 11 The Heath Runcorn Cheshire WA7 4QE / GB | Application number, filing date | 89305662.2 | 05.06.1989 | [1989/52] | Priority number, date | GB19880015065 | 24.06.1988 Original published format: GB 8815065 | [1989/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0348061 | Date: | 27.12.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/52] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0348061 | Date: | 19.09.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0348061 | Date: | 25.10.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.07.1990 | Classification | IPC: | A61F2/00, A61C13/00, B29C35/08 | [1995/43] | CPC: |
A61C13/0013 (EP,US);
A61C13/0004 (EP,US);
A61C5/77 (EP,US);
G16H20/40 (US)
|
Former IPC [1989/52] | A61C13/00 | Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, SE [1989/52] | Title | German: | Stereolithographisches Verfahren zur Herstellung von Prothesen | [1995/43] | English: | Stereolithographic Process for Preparing Prosthetic Devices | [1995/43] | French: | Procédé stéréolithographique de fabrication de prothèses | [1995/43] |
Former [1989/52] | Prosthetische Vorrichtungen | ||
Former [1989/52] | Prosthetic devices | ||
Former [1989/52] | Dispositifs prostétiques | Examination procedure | 19.02.1991 | Examination requested [1991/16] | 09.06.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.10.1992 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1993/16] | 20.11.1992 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1993/16] | 08.09.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.12.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.04.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.05.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 24.06.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.08.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 20.12.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.01.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 09.01.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.07.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/42] | Request for further processing for: | 08.09.1993 | Request for further processing filed | 08.09.1993 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 19.11.1993 | Decision despatched | Request for re-establishment of rights: | 08.09.1993 | Date of receipt | 19.11.1993 | Request accepted | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.05.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.05.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.09.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.05.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 01.05.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.1993 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   08.09.1993 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | SE | 25.01.1996 | [1996/23] | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0054785 ; | [YD]US4575330 (HULL CHARLES W [US]); | [A]EP0146191 (PHILIPS NV [NL]); | [AD]EP0162651 (ICI PLC [GB]); | [AD]EP0090493 (ICI PLC [GB]) |