EP0346115 - Morpholine derivatives [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.12.1990 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 13.08.2008 [2008/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GLAXO GROUP LIMITED Glaxo Wellcome House, Berkeley Avenue Greenford, Middlesex UB6 0NN / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1989/50] | For all designated states GLAXO GROUP LIMITED Clarges House 6-12 Clarges Street London W1Y 8DH / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bays, David Edmund 9 Windmill Field Ware, Hertfordshire / GB | 02 /
Scopes, David Ian Carter Gable View, The Causeway Furneaux Pelham, Hertfordshire / GB | [1989/50] | Representative(s) | Pett, Christopher Phineas, et al Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | Pett, Christopher Phineas, et al Frank B. Dehn & Co. St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | ||
Former [1989/50] | Pett, Christopher Phineas, et al Frank B. Dehn & Co. European Patent Attorneys Imperial House 15-19 Kingsway London WC2B 6UZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 89305787.7 | 08.06.1989 | [1989/50] | Priority number, date | GB19880013714 | 09.06.1988 Original published format: GB 8813714 | [1989/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0346115 | Date: | 13.12.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.08.1989 | Classification | IPC: | C07D265/28, C07D413/08, A61K31/535 | [1989/50] | CPC: |
C07D265/30 (EP,US);
A61P25/04 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1989/50] | Title | German: | Morpholin-Derivate | [1989/50] | English: | Morpholine derivatives | [1989/50] | French: | Dérivés de morpholine | [1989/50] | File destroyed: | 01.02.1999 | Examination procedure | 14.06.1990 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1991/04] | 04.09.1990 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1991/04] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 90, no. 3, January 15, 1979, Columbus, Ohio, USA T. TAHARA et al. "Morpholine derivatives" page 658, column 1abstract-no. 23 071w |