Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
09.11.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.12.1993 [1993/52] |
27.01.1993 | First examination report | |
08.02.1992 | Request for examination filed | published on 01.04.1992 [1992/14] |
12.11.1991 | Publication of search report | published on 02.01.1992 [1992/01] |
28.10.1989 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 13.12.1989 [1989/50] |