EP0354652 - Novel alpha-N-acetylgalactosaminyltransferase and method of detecting tumour cells using same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 22.10.1993 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.10.1993 | Refusal of application | published on 15.12.1993 [1993/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Biomembrane Institute 201 Elliott Avenue West Suite 305 Seattle Washington 98119 / US | For all designated states Fred Hutchinson Cancer Research Center 1124 Columbia Street Seattle Washington 98104 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1990/07] | For all designated states The Biomembrane Institute 201 Elliott Avenue West Suite 305 Seattle Washington 98119 / US | ||
For all designated states Fred Hutchinson Cancer Research Center 1124 Columbia Street Seattle Washington 98104 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Matsuura, Hidemitsu Fred Hutchinson Cancer Research Center 1124 Columbia Street Seattle Washington 98104 / US | 02 /
Hakomori, Sen-Itiroh The Biomembrane Institute 201 Elliott Avenue West Seattle Washington 98119 / US | [1990/07] | Representative(s) | Woodcraft, David Charles, et al Brookes Batchellor 102-108 Clerkenwell Road London EC1M 5SA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1990/07] | Woodcraft, David Charles, et al BROOKES & MARTIN High Holborn House 52/54 High Holborn London, WC1V 6SE / GB | Application number, filing date | 89306283.6 | 22.06.1989 | [1990/07] | Priority number, date | US19880231576 | 12.08.1988 Original published format: US 231576 | [1990/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0354652 | Date: | 14.02.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/07] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0354652 | Date: | 17.07.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.05.1991 | Classification | IPC: | C12N9/10, C12Q1/48, G01N33/574, G01N33/68 | [1991/32] | CPC: |
C12N9/1051 (EP);
C12Q1/48 (EP);
G01N33/573 (EP);
G01N33/57492 (EP);
G01N2333/4742 (EP);
G01N2333/91091 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1990/07] | C12N9/10, C12Q1/48, G01N33/68, G01N33/574 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1990/07] | Title | German: | Alpha-N-Acetylgalactosaminyltransferase und ihre Verwendung zum Nachweis von Tumorzellen | [1990/07] | English: | Novel alpha-N-acetylgalactosaminyltransferase and method of detecting tumour cells using same | [1990/07] | French: | Alpha-N-acétylgalactosaminyltransférase et méthode de détection des cellules tumorales l'utilisant | [1990/07] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | deleted | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.01.1992 | Examination requested [1992/11] | 26.01.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 08.07.1993 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [1993/50] | 18.07.1993 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1993/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.06.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.1993 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Vol. 97, No. 7, 16 August 1982, Columbus, Ohio, USA; PAUL, A et al.: "Demonstration of alpha-N-acetylgalactosaminyltransferase activity in secreting ovarian tumors obtained from blood group O subjects", page 438, right-hand column; Ref. No. 53417A, Abstract. | [ ] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Vol. 107, No. 19, 09 November 1987, Columbus, Ohio, USA, HRZENJAC, T. et al.: "Gangliosides and glycoproteinic antigen from human breast tumors", page 504, right-hand column; Ref. No. 173502W, Abstract. | [ ] - Proceedings of the National Academy of Sciences of USA, Vol. 82, October 1985, Washington US, pages 6517-6521; MATSUURA, H. & HAKOMORI, S.: "The oncofetal domain of fibronectin defined by monoclonal antibody FDC-6: its presence in fibronectins from fetal and tumor tissues and its absence in those from normal adult tissues and plasma", the whole document. | [ ] - Journal of Biological Chemistry, Vol. 263, No. 7, 05 March 1988, Baltimore US, pages 3314-3322; MATSUURA, H. et al.: "The oncofetal structure of human fibronectin defined by monoclonal antibody FDC-6", the whole document. | [ ] - Journal of Biological Chemistry, Vol. 264, No. 18, 25 June 1989, Baltimore US, MATSUURA, H. et al.: "An alpha-N-acetylgalactosaminylation at the threonine residue of a defined peptide sequence creates the oncofetal peptide epitope in human fibronectin", pages 10472-10476, the whole document. | [ ] - Journal of Biological Chemistry, Vol. 249, No. 11, 10 June 1974, Baltimore US, pages 3442-3447; WHITEHEAD, J.S. et al.: "An N-acetylgalactosaminyltransferase from human blood group A plasma", the whole document. |