EP0403702 - Trolleys [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.08.1993 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.05.2008 | Change - representative | published on 04.06.2008 [2008/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ribeiro, Carlos Jorge Duarte 7 Priestlands Place Lymington Hampshire SO41 9GA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1990/52] | For all designated states Ribeiro, Carlos Jorge Duarte 7 Priestlands Place Lymington Hampshire SO41 9GA / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1990/52] | Representative(s) | Lomas, Geoffrey Michael, et al Barker Brettell LLP Medina Chambers Town Quay Southampton SO14 2AQ / GB | [2008/23] |
Former [1990/52] | Lomas, Geoffrey Michael, et al Barker, Brettell & Boutland Prudential Buildings 97-101 Above Bar Street Southampton SO9 4GT / GB | Application number, filing date | 89306307.3 | 22.06.1989 | [1990/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0403702 | Date: | 27.12.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.03.1990 | Classification | IPC: | B62B3/10 | [1990/52] | CPC: |
B62B3/14 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1990/52] | Title | German: | Handwagen | [1990/52] | English: | Trolleys | [1990/52] | French: | Chariot | [1990/52] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 11.06.1991 | Examination requested [1991/33] | 01.10.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.04.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1993/40] | 12.05.1993 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1993/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.06.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.06.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.1993 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3536283 ; | [X]GB968950 ; | [X]US2776843 |