EP0348203 - Phenolic thioethers, their production and use [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.12.1993 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.12.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.02.1994 [1994/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SHIONOGI SEIYAKU KABUSHIKI KAISHA trading under the name of SHIONOGI & CO. LTD. 1-8, Doshomachi 3-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka 541 / JP | [1989/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kita, Toru Chisan Mansion Ichijoji 603 40, Somedono-cho Ichijoji Sakyo-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto-fu / JP | 02 /
Narumiya, Shuh Sky Mansion 413, 561-4, Komanomachi Marutamachikudaru Nakamachidori Kamigyo-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto-fu / JP | 03 /
Narisada, Masayuki 3-24-5, Ayukawa Ibaraki-shi Osaka-fu / JP | 04 /
Watanabe, Fumihiko 726-44, Ohazashimomaki Kanmaki-cho Kitakatsuragi-gun Nara-ken / JP | 05 /
Matsumoto, Saichi 3-2-11, Fushioda Ikeda-shi Osaka-fu / JP | 06 /
Doteuchi, Masami 33-3, Ogurahigashimachi Hirakata-shi Osaka-fu / JP | 07 /
Mizui, Takuji 1-5-16, Yamamotodai Takarazuka-shi Hyogo-ken / JP | [1989/52] | Representative(s) | Hardisty, David Robert, et al BOULT WADE TENNANT, Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1991/46] | Hardisty, David Robert, et al BOULT, WADE & TENNANT 27 Furnival Street London EC4A IPQ / GB | ||
Former [1989/52] | Bizley, Richard Edward BOULT, WADE & TENNANT 27 Furnival Street London EC4A 1PQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 89306331.3 | 23.06.1989 | [1989/52] | Priority number, date | JP19880157849 | 24.06.1988 Original published format: JP 15784988 | [1989/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0348203 | Date: | 27.12.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0348203 | Date: | 24.02.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.10.1989 | Classification | IPC: | C07C323/22, A61K31/10 | [1993/08] | CPC: |
C07C323/52 (EP,US);
C07C323/62 (KR);
A61K31/10 (KR);
A61P1/04 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P3/06 (EP);
A61P37/08 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP);
A61P9/14 (EP);
Y02P20/55 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [1989/52] | C07C149/40, A61K31/10 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1989/52] | Title | German: | Phenolische Thioäther, deren Herstellung und Verwendung | [1989/52] | English: | Phenolic thioethers, their production and use | [1989/52] | French: | Thioéthers phénoliques, leur préparation et leur utilisaton | [1989/52] | Examination procedure | 27.11.1989 | Examination requested [1990/04] | 06.09.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.12.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.05.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 29.07.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 04.08.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.11.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 06.11.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.11.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.05.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE1936463 (BOEHRINGER SOHN INGELHEIM); | [X]DE2406812 (DOW CHEMICAL CO); | [XD]US4076841 (WAGNER EUGENE R, et al); | [A]EP0079855 (CIBA GEIGY AG [CH]); | [X]EP0190682 (SEARLE & CO [US]) | [AD] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 94, no. 5, February 2, 1981, Columbus, Ohio, USA MAMEDOV, CH.I. "Synthesis of sulfur-containing derivatives of 2,6-di.-tert.-butyl- phenols" page 528, Abstract-no. 30 290c |