Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP0352903
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
17.04.2015 |
Change - lapse in a contracting state |
published on 20.05.2015 [2015/21] |
04.10.1996 |
Change - lapse in a contracting state |
published on 20.11.1996 [1996/47] |
26.07.1995 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.09.1995 [1995/37] |
05.01.1995 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 22.02.1995 [1995/08] |
14.01.1994 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 02.03.1994 [1994/09] |
07.06.1991 |
First examination report |
|
14.11.1990 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 02.01.1991 [1991/01] |
26.04.1990 |
Publication of search report |
published on 13.06.1990 [1990/24] |
20.04.1990 |
Change - classification |
published on 06.06.1990 [1990/23] |
20.04.1990 |
Change - classification |
published on 06.06.1990 [1990/23] |
15.12.1989 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 31.01.1990 [1990/05] |