EP0349206 - Bonded array of transmission media [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.07.2000 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.07.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 30.08.2000 [2000/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AT&T Corp. 32 Avenue of the Americas New York, NY 10013-2412 / US | [1990/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Jackson, Kenneth W. 1800 Berry Lane Snellville Georgia 30278 / US | 02 /
Lochkovic, Gregory Alan 1210 Howard Way Lawrenceville Georgia 30243 / US | 03 /
Patel, Parbhubhai D. 5001 Buckline Crossing Dunwoody Georgia 30338 / US | 04 /
Pearsall, Michael L. 1215 The Falls Parkway Duluth Georgia 30136 / US | 05 /
Petisce, James R. 622 Hampton Ridge Road Norcross Georgia 30093 / US | [1990/01] | Representative(s) | Johnston, Kenneth Graham, et al Lucent Technologies EUR-IP UK Ltd Unit 18, Core 3 Workzone Innova Business Park Electric Avenue Enfield, EN3 7XB / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1990/01] | Johnston, Kenneth Graham, et al AT&T (UK) LTD. AT&T Intellectual Property Division 5 Mornington Road Woodford Green Essex, IG8 OTU / GB | Application number, filing date | 89306348.7 | 23.06.1989 | [1990/01] | Priority number, date | US19880213876 | 30.06.1988 Original published format: US 213876 | [1990/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0349206 | Date: | 03.01.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/01] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0349206 | Date: | 05.09.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0349206 | Date: | 15.09.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.07.1990 | Classification | IPC: | G02B6/44 | [1990/01] | CPC: |
G02B6/4416 (EP,US);
G02B6/24 (KR);
G02B6/04 (EP,US);
G02B6/4401 (EP,US);
G02B6/4403 (EP,US);
G02B6/4404 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, SE [1990/01] | Title | German: | Verbundmatrix aus transmittierenden Medien | [1990/01] | English: | Bonded array of transmission media | [1990/01] | French: | Matrice combinée de médias de transmission | [1990/01] | Examination procedure | 11.12.1990 | Examination requested [1991/08] | 29.07.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.01.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.07.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.01.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.07.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.01.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.10.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 22.12.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.10.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.04.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.01.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.07.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.09.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 19.03.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.05.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 27.05.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP99104577.4 / EP0922980 | Opposition(s) | 16.06.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.06.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.06.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.06.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 16.06.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.06.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 16.06.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 18.06.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 11.06.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0104864 (BICC PLC [GB]); | [A]EP0194891 (TELEPHONE CABLES LTD [GB]); | [Y]DE3606626 (SIEMENS AG [DE]); | [Y]EP0262340 (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES [JP]) | [A] - PROCEEDINGS OF THE 5TH INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON INTEGRATED OPTICS AND OPTICAL FIBRE COMMUNICATION - 11TH EUROPEAN CONFERENCE ON OPTICAL COMMUNICATION, 1-4 October 1985, pages 379-382, VENICE ITALY, N. NIRASAWA et al.: "Design for fiber tape with improved lateral pressure resistance" | [A] - OPTICAL FIBER COMMUNICATION CONFERENCE AND SIXTH INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON INTEGRATED OPTICS AND OPTICAL FIBER COMMUNICATION TECHNICAL DIGEST 19-22 January 1987, page 95, paper TUP 3, WASHINGTON, US, OGAI et al.: "Fiber ribbon in slotted core" | Examination | JPS60200213 | GB2184563 | - JOURNAL OF LIGHTWAVE TECHNOLOGY., vol. LT-4, no. 3, pages 335 to 340 |