EP0371577 - Easily upgradable video memory system and method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.03.1995 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.04.2002 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 12.06.2002 [2002/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DIGITAL EQUIPMENT CORPORATION 111 Powdermill Road Maynard Massachusetts 01754-1418 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1990/23] | For all designated states DIGITAL EQUIPMENT CORPORATION 111 Powdermill Road Maynard Massachusetts 01754-1418 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Furlong, Thomas C. 2300 Winged Foot Road Half Moon Bay California 84019 / US | [1990/23] | Representative(s) | Goodman, Christopher, et al Eric Potter Clarkson, Park View House, 58 The Ropewalk Nottingham NG1 5DD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1990/23] | Goodman, Christopher, et al Eric Potter & Clarkson St. Mary's Court St. Mary's Gate Nottingham NG1 1LE / GB | Application number, filing date | 89306572.2 | 28.06.1989 | [1990/23] | Priority number, date | US19880277059 | 28.11.1988 Original published format: US 277059 | [1990/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0371577 | Date: | 06.06.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/23] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0371577 | Date: | 27.03.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0371577 | Date: | 18.05.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.02.1991 | Classification | IPC: | G09G1/02 | [1990/23] | CPC: |
G09G5/02 (EP,US);
G09G5/395 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1990/23] | Title | German: | Leicht erweiterbares Video-Speichersystem und Methode dafür | [1990/23] | English: | Easily upgradable video memory system and method | [1990/23] | French: | Système de mémoire vidéo facilement extensible et méthode pour cela | [1990/23] | Examination procedure | 14.07.1989 | Examination requested [1990/23] | 25.02.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.04.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.08.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 12.11.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.01.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 07.01.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.02.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.06.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.05.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.05.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 18.05.1994 | BE | 18.05.1994 | CH | 18.05.1994 | ES | 18.05.1994 | GR | 18.05.1994 | LI | 18.05.1994 | NL | 18.05.1994 | SE | 18.05.1994 | LU | 30.06.1994 | [2002/24] |
Former [2002/23] | AT | 18.05.1994 | |
BE | 18.05.1994 | ||
CH | 18.05.1994 | ||
GR | 18.05.1994 | ||
LI | 18.05.1994 | ||
NL | 18.05.1994 | ||
SE | 18.05.1994 | ||
LU | 30.06.1994 | ||
Former [2000/04] | AT | 18.05.1994 | |
BE | 18.05.1994 | ||
CH | 18.05.1994 | ||
GR | 18.05.1994 | ||
LI | 18.05.1994 | ||
NL | 18.05.1994 | ||
LU | 30.06.1994 | ||
Former [1995/12] | AT | 18.05.1994 | |
BE | 18.05.1994 | ||
CH | 18.05.1994 | ||
LI | 18.05.1994 | ||
NL | 18.05.1994 | ||
Former [1995/11] | AT | 18.05.1994 | |
BE | 18.05.1994 | ||
CH | 18.05.1994 | ||
LI | 18.05.1994 | ||
Former [1995/02] | AT | 18.05.1994 | |
CH | 18.05.1994 | ||
LI | 18.05.1994 | ||
Former [1994/48] | CH | 18.05.1994 | |
LI | 18.05.1994 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB2073995 (AMPEX); | [A]GB2146811 (MOTOROLA INC); | [A]EP0238188 (INMOS LTD [GB]) |