EP0351154 - Metal-coated plastic product mould and procedure for manufacturing the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.10.1995 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.12.1999 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 09.02.2000 [2000/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NESTE OY Keilaniemi SF-02150 Espoo 15 / FI | [1990/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Jovero, Olli Lokkitie 11 SF-06100 Porvoo / FI | 02 /
Kirmanen, Pauli Viikinkitie 11 C 76 SF-06150 Porvoo / FI | [1990/03] | Representative(s) | Lamb, John Baxter, et al Marks & Clerk 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1990/03] | Lamb, John Baxter, et al MARKS & CLERK, 57-60 Lincoln's Inn Fields London WC2A 3LS / GB | Application number, filing date | 89306960.9 | 10.07.1989 | [1990/03] | Priority number, date | FI19880003349 | 14.07.1988 Original published format: FI 883349 | [1990/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0351154 | Date: | 17.01.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/03] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0351154 | Date: | 24.04.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0351154 | Date: | 14.12.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.03.1991 | Classification | IPC: | B29C33/56, B29C33/38 | [1990/03] | CPC: |
B29C33/56 (EP);
B23P15/24 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1990/03] | Title | German: | Form mit Metallüberzug für Kunststoffgegenstände und Verfahren zu deren Herstellung | [1990/03] | English: | Metal-coated plastic product mould and procedure for manufacturing the same | [1990/03] | French: | Moule revêtu de métal pour objet plastique et son procédé de fabrication | [1990/03] | Examination procedure | 14.03.1990 | Examination requested [1990/20] | 06.04.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.07.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.09.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 22.10.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.02.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 15.06.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.09.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 14.09.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.09.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.07.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.07.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.07.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.07.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | LU | 31.07.1995 | [2000/06] | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP5534950 ; | [A]FR1243682 (HUELS CHEMISCHE WERKE AG); | [X]FR2110467 (HENNECKE GMBH MASCHF [DE]); | [X]FR2159231 (ANZIANI VENTE BERNARD); | [A]GB2105251 (NEW PRESS TOOLS LIMITED [GB]) | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 4, no. 72 (M-13)[554], 27th May 1980; & JP-A-55 34 950 (MITSUBISHI DENKI K.K.) 11-03-1980, & JP5534950 A 00000000 |