EP0351173 - Substance having anti-retrovirus activity [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.04.1994 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.04.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.06.1994 [1994/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states OSAKA PREFECTURE 1-22 Otemae 2-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka / JP | For all designated states TANABE SEIYAKU CO., LTD. 2-10, Dosho-machi 3-chome Chuo-ku Osaka / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1990/03] | For all designated states OSAKA PREFECTURE 1-22 Otemae 2-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi / JP | ||
For all designated states TANABE SEIYAKU CO., LTD. 2-10, Dosho-machi 3-chome Chuo-ku Osaka / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Otake, Toru 22-26, Sekiyakita 7-chome Kashiba-cho Kitakatsuragi-gun Nara-ken / JP | 02 /
Mori, Haruyo 2-12, Akanedai 1-chome Haibara-cho Uda-gun Nara-ken / JP | 03 /
Ueba, Noboru 81-10, Izumihara-cho Yamatokoriyama-shi Nara-ken / JP | 04 /
Miyano, Keiichi 19-6, Kuranouchi Habikino-shi Osaka-fu / JP | 05 /
Matsumoto, Kazuo 23-27, Yamate-dai 5-chome Ibaraki-shi Osaka-fu / JP | 06 /
Moriya, Tamon 5-9, Kitashowadai-cho Takatsuki-shi Osaka-fu / JP | [1990/03] | Representative(s) | Hardisty, David Robert, et al BOULT WADE TENNANT, Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1990/03] | Hardisty, David Robert, et al BOULT, WADE & TENNANT 27 Furnival Street London EC4A IPQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 89307000.3 | 10.07.1989 | [1990/03] | Priority number, date | JP19880176133 | 14.07.1988 Original published format: JP 17613388 | [1990/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0351173 | Date: | 17.01.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/03] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0351173 | Date: | 05.06.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.04.1991 | Classification | IPC: | C07H17/08, A61K31/70 | [1990/03] | CPC: |
A61P31/12 (EP);
C07H17/08 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1990/03] | Title | German: | Substanz mit antiretroviraler Aktivität | [1990/03] | English: | Substance having anti-retrovirus activity | [1990/03] | French: | Substance à activité antirétrovirale | [1990/03] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 09.09.1991 | Examination requested [1991/45] | 12.08.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.12.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1994/24] | 21.01.1994 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1994/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.06.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.05.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.1993 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2431508 (POLITECHNIKA GDANSKA [PL]) | [XP] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 111, no. 19, 6th November 1989, page 19, abstract no. 166825h, Columbus, Ohio, US; T. OTAKE: "Inhibitory effect of sulfated amphotericin B on the proliferation of human immunodeficiency virus in vitro", & YONAGO IGAKU ZASSHI 1989, 40(3), 373-81 |