EP0351210 - Data base management system and method therefor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1990/03] | Data base management system | ||
[1999/15] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.11.2000 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.10.2005 | Change: Appeal number | Applicant(s) | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation New Orchard Road Armonk, NY 10504 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1990/03] | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation Old Orchard Road Armonk, N.Y. 10504 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Haderle, Donald James 812 Lilac Way Los Gatos, CA 95030 / US | 02 /
Watts, Julie Ann 734 Natoma Drive San Jose, CA 95123 / US | [1990/03] | Representative(s) | Davies, Simon Robert, et al I B M UK Intellectual Property Department Hursley Park Winchester, Hampshire SO21 2JN / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/01] | Davies, Simon Robert, et al I B M UK Intellectual Property Department Hursley Park Winchester, Hampshire SO21 2JN / GB | ||
Former [1990/03] | Burt, Roger James, Dr. IBM United Kingdom Limited Intellectual Property Department Hursley Park Winchester Hampshire SO21 2JN / GB | Application number, filing date | 89307080.5 | 12.07.1989 | [1990/03] | Priority number, date | US19880219512 | 15.07.1988 Original published format: US 219512 | [1990/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0351210 | Date: | 17.01.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/03] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0351210 | Date: | 14.10.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0351210 | Date: | 05.01.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.08.1992 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/30 | [2000/01] | CPC: |
G06F16/2365 (EP,US);
Y10S707/99952 (US)
|
Former IPC [1990/03] | G06F15/40 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1990/03] | Title | German: | Datenbankverwaltungssystem und Verfahren hierfür | [1999/15] | English: | Data base management system and method therefor | [1999/15] | French: | Système de gestion de base de données et méthode correspondante | [1999/15] |
Former [1990/03] | Datenbankverwaltungssystem | ||
Former [1990/03] | Data base management system | ||
Former [1990/03] | Système de gestion de base de données | Examination procedure | 12.05.1990 | Examination requested [1990/28] | 25.05.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.08.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.03.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.10.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.05.1995 | Date of oral proceedings | 01.06.1995 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 02.10.1995 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1} | 28.04.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.05.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.03.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 16.06.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.06.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 29.06.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Appeal following examination | 26.10.1995 | Appeal received No. T0192/96 | 09.02.1996 | Statement of grounds filed | 15.10.1997 | Result of appeal procedure: continuation of examination procedure | 15.10.1997 | Date of oral proceedings | 20.10.1997 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Opposition(s) | 06.10.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.07.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.07.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.07.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.07.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.07.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 16.07.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 17.07.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 20.07.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AP] - PROCEEDINGS INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON DATABASES IN PARALLEL AND DISTRIBUTED SYSTEMS, 5 December 1988, Austin, (USA) pages 202 - 209; M. SAMY GAMAL-ELDIN ET AL: "Integrating Relational Databases with Support for Updates" | [A] - 7TH INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON VERY LARGE DATA BASES, 9 September 1981, CANNES, FRANCE; pages 2 - 12; C. J. DATE: " REFERENTIAL INTEGRITY" | Examination | - THE 2ND INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON COMPUTERS AND APPLICATIONS, June 23-27, 1987, BEIJING, CHINA, pages 733-741; K.K. CHAN et al.: "An Implementation Algorithm For Integrity Enforcement". |