EP0351227 - Reinforced polyethylene [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.06.1992 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.06.1992 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.07.1992 [1992/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BOWTHORPE-HELLERMANN LIMITED Gatwick Road Crawley West Sussex RH10 2RZ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1990/03] | For all designated states BOWTHORPE-HELLERMANN LIMITED Gatwick Road Crawley West Sussex RH10 2RZ / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Robinson, Joseph Gordon Claybrook The Hyde Winchcombe Cheltenham Gloucester / GB | 02 /
Mackley, Malcolm Robert 32, Chesterton Hall Crescent Cambridge / GB | 03 /
Cole, Edward 17, Saint Bridget Avenue Plymouth Devon / GB | [1990/03] | Representative(s) | Austin, Hedley William, et al Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP Churchill House Churchill Way Cardiff CF10 2HH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1990/03] | Austin, Hedley William, et al Urquhart-Dykes & Lord Alexandra House 1 Alexandra Road Swansea West Glamorgan SA1 5ED / GB | Application number, filing date | 89307138.1 | 14.07.1989 | [1990/03] | Priority number, date | GB19880016746 | 14.07.1988 Original published format: GB 8816746 | GB19890004497 | 28.02.1989 Original published format: GB 8904497 | [1990/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0351227 | Date: | 17.01.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/03] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0351227 | Date: | 25.03.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.02.1992 | Classification | IPC: | C08L23/06, // (C08L23/06, 23:06) | [1990/03] | CPC: |
C08L23/06 (EP);
C08K7/02 (EP);
C08L2205/02 (EP);
C08L2205/03 (EP);
C08L2205/16 (EP);
C08L23/0815 (EP);
C08L2312/00 (EP)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C08K7/02, C08L23/04 (EP);
C08L23/06, C08L2666/02 (EP);
C08L23/06, C08L2666/06 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, LI, NL [1990/03] | Title | German: | Verstärktes Polyethylen | [1990/03] | English: | Reinforced polyethylene | [1990/03] | French: | Polyéthylène renforcé | [1990/03] | File destroyed: | 21.02.2000 | Examination procedure | 01.08.1991 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1992/30] | 25.02.1992 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1992/30] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.1991 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0229477 ; | [X]EP0115192 ; | [X]EP0102096 ; | [X]FR2226438 |