EP0353891 - Synchronising fractional tap equalisation with received signals [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.06.1994 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.06.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.07.1994 [1994/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation New Orchard Road Armonk, NY 10504 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1990/06] | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation Old Orchard Road Armonk, N.Y. 10504 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Davis, Gordon Taylor 101 SW 11th Court Boca Raton Florida 33486 / US | 02 /
Mandalia, Baiju Dhirajlal 9900 Baywater Drive Boca Raton Florida 33496 / US | [1990/06] | Representative(s) | Blakemore, Frederick Norman IBM United Kingdom Limited Intellectual Property Department Hursley Park Winchester Hampshire SO21 2JN / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1992/10] | Blakemore, Frederick Norman IBM United Kingdom Limited Intellectual Property Department Hursley Park Winchester Hampshire SO21 2JN / GB | ||
Former [1990/06] | Grant, Iain Murray IBM United Kingdom Limited Intellectual Property Department Hursley Park Winchester Hampshire SO21 2JN / GB | Application number, filing date | 89307145.6 | 14.07.1989 | [1990/06] | Priority number, date | US19880227582 | 02.08.1988 Original published format: US 227582 | [1990/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0353891 | Date: | 07.02.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/06] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0353891 | Date: | 29.01.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.12.1991 | Classification | IPC: | H04L7/033, H04L7/02, H04L25/03 | [1992/05] | CPC: |
H04L7/0058 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1990/06] | H04L7/033, H04L7/02 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1990/06] | Title | German: | Synchronisierung der geteilten Abzweig-Entzerrung mit empfangenen Signalen | [1990/06] | English: | Synchronising fractional tap equalisation with received signals | [1990/06] | French: | Synchronisation d'égalisation à espacement fractionné aux signaux reçus | [1990/06] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 21.06.1990 | Examination requested [1990/33] | 13.12.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.02.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1994/30] | 03.03.1994 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1994/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.07.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.1993 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0201281 (AMERICAN TELEPHONE & TELEGRAPH [US]) | [Y] - IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON COMMUNICATIONS, vol. COM-21, September 1973, pages 1046-1052, New York, US; S.U.H. QURESHI: "Adjustment of the position of the reference tap of an adaptive equalizer" | [YD] - IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON COMMUNICATIONS, vol. COM-24, no. 8, August 1976, pages 856-864, New York, US; G. UNGERBOECK: "Fractional tap-spacing equalizer and consequences for clock recovery in data modems" | [Y] - IEEE GLOBAL TELECOMMUNICATIONS CONFERENCE, CONFERENCE RECORD, Tokyo, 15th - 18th November 1987, vol. 2, pages 1207-1211; B. BACCETTI et al.: "Fractionally spaced versus T-spaced adaptive equalization for high-level QAM radio systems" |