Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU617499B | Global Dossier | 28.11.1991 | B2 | AU3918389 | 08.02.1990 | A | Priority number | Date | GB8818706 | 05.08.1988 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0353908 | Global Dossier | 17.05.1995 | B1 | EP0353908 | 01.08.1990 | A3 | EP0353908 | 07.02.1990 | A2 | Priority number | Date | GB8818706 | 05.08.1988 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE122717T | 15.06.1995 | T1 | Priority number | Date | GB8818706 | 05.08.1988 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE68922669T | 05.10.1995 | T2 | DE68922669D1 | 22.06.1995 | D1 | Priority number | Date | GB8818706 | 05.08.1988 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | GB8818706D0 | 07.09.1988 | D0 | Priority number | Date | GB8818706 | 05.08.1988 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPH0286783 | 27.03.1990 | A | Priority number | Date | GB8818706 | 05.08.1988 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | NZ230206 | 25.06.1991 | A | Priority number | Date | GB8818706 | 05.08.1988 |