EP0353908 - DNA constructs and plant incorporating them [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.03.1996 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.01.2003 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): NL | published on 12.03.2003 [2003/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Zeneca Limited 15 Stanhope Gate London W1Y 6LN / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1993/46] | For all designated states ZENECA LIMITED 15 Stanhope Gate London W1Y 6LN / GB | ||
Former [1990/06] | For all designated states IMPERIAL CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES PLC Imperial Chemical House, Millbank London SW1P 3JF / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ely, Susan 64 Newfield Gardens Marlow Bucks S17 1JP / GB | 02 /
Ray, John Anthony 30 Sylvanus Wooden Hill Bracknell RG12 4XX / GB | 03 /
Schuch, Wolfgang Walter 14 Greenfinch Close Heathlake Park Growthorne Berkshire / GB | 04 /
Knight, Mary Elizabeth 14 Greenfinch Close Heathlake Park Growthorne Berkshire / GB | [1990/06] | Representative(s) | Huskisson, Frank Mackie, et al Syngenta Limited Intellectual Property Department Jealott's Hill International Research Centre PO Box 3538 Bracknell Berkshire RG42 6EY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1995/20] | Huskisson, Frank Mackie, et al Intellectual Property Group, Zeneca Seeds, Jealott's Hill Research Station, PO Box No 3539 Bracknell, Berkshire RG12 6YD / GB | ||
Former [1990/06] | Huskisson, Frank Mackie ICI Group Patents Services Dept. PO Box 6 Shire Park Bessemer Road Welwyn Garden City Herts, AL7 1HD / GB | Application number, filing date | 89307342.9 | 19.07.1989 | [1990/06] | Priority number, date | GB19880018706 | 05.08.1988 Original published format: GB 8818706 | [1990/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0353908 | Date: | 07.02.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/06] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0353908 | Date: | 01.08.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0353908 | Date: | 17.05.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.06.1990 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/29, C12N15/32, C12N15/82 | [1990/06] | CPC: |
C12N15/8286 (EP);
C07K14/325 (EP);
C07K14/415 (EP);
Y02A40/146 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1990/06] | Title | German: | DNS-Konstruktionen und enthaltende Pflanzen | [1990/06] | English: | DNA constructs and plant incorporating them | [1990/06] | French: | Constructions d'ADN et plantes les incorporant | [1990/06] | Examination procedure | 26.11.1990 | Examination requested [1991/04] | 04.03.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.03.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.01.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 21.01.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.05.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 15.11.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.11.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 25.11.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.02.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.06.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.06.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.06.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.06.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 17.05.1995 | CH | 17.05.1995 | ES | 17.05.1995 | GR | 17.05.1995 | LI | 17.05.1995 | NL | 17.05.1995 | LU | 31.07.1995 | SE | 17.08.1995 | [2003/11] |
Former [2002/24] | AT | 17.05.1995 | |
CH | 17.05.1995 | ||
ES | 17.05.1995 | ||
GR | 17.05.1995 | ||
LI | 17.05.1995 | ||
LU | 31.07.1995 | ||
NL | 31.07.1995 | ||
SE | 17.08.1995 | ||
Former [2000/27] | AT | 17.05.1995 | |
CH | 17.05.1995 | ||
GR | 17.05.1995 | ||
LI | 17.05.1995 | ||
LU | 31.07.1995 | ||
NL | 31.07.1995 | ||
SE | 17.08.1995 | ||
Former [2000/04] | AT | 17.05.1995 | |
CH | 17.05.1995 | ||
GR | 17.05.1995 | ||
LI | 17.05.1995 | ||
LU | 31.07.1995 | ||
SE | 17.08.1995 | ||
Former [1996/04] | AT | 17.05.1995 | |
CH | 17.05.1995 | ||
LI | 17.05.1995 | ||
SE | 17.08.1995 | ||
Former [1996/02] | AT | 17.05.1995 | |
CH | 17.05.1995 | ||
LI | 17.05.1995 | ||
Former [1995/49] | CH | 17.05.1995 | |
LI | 17.05.1995 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0193259 (PLANT GENETIC SYSTEMS NV [BE]); | [Y]EP0256223 (CIBA GEIGY AG [CH]); | [A]EP0240208 (CALGENE INC [US]) | [Y] - MGG MOLECULAR AND GENERAL GENETICS vol. 215, no. 3, February 1989, pages 431-440, Berlin, DE; T.D. SULLIVAN et al.: "Isolation and characterization of a maize chlorophyll a/b binding protein gene that produces high levels of mRNA in the dark" | [AD] - NATURE vol. 323, October 1986, pages 551-554 London, GB; J. SIMPSON et al.: "Light-inducible and tissue-specific pea lhcp gene expression involves an upstream element combining enhancer- and silencer-like properties" | [AD] - THE EMBO JOURNAL | [AD] - NATURE | Examination | - MGG MOLECULAR AND GENERAL GENETICS vol. 215, no. 3, February 1988 pp. 431-440, Berlin, DE; T.D. SULLIVAN et al. | - Nature, vol. 323, October 1986, pp. 551-554, London, GB; J. SIMPSONet al. | - NATURE, vol. 316, August 1985, pp. 750-752, London, GB; G. LAMPPA et al. | - THE EMBO JOURNAL, vol. 6, no. 9, 1987, pp. 2537-2542, Oxford, GB; F. NAGY et al. |