EP0352122 - Heat development type diazo copying material [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.01.1995 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.01.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 15.03.1995 [1995/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJI PHOTO FILM CO., LTD. 210 Nakanuma Minami-Ashigara-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1990/04] | For all designated states FUJI PHOTO FILM CO., LTD. 210 Nakanuma Minami Ashigara-shi Kanagawa / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nakamura, Kotaro Fuji Photo Film Co., Ltd. No. 200, Onakazato Fujinomiya-shi Shizuoka / JP | 02 /
Tanaka, Toshiharu Fuji Photo Film Co., Ltd. No. 200, Onakazato Fujinomiya-shi Shizuoka / JP | 03 /
Shimada, Hirokazu Fuji Photo Film Co., Ltd. No. 200, Onakazato Fujinomiya-shi Shizuoka / JP | [1994/12] |
Former [1990/04] | 01 /
Nakamura, Kotara Fuji Photo Film Co., Ltd. No. 200, Onakazato Fujinomiya-shi Shizuoka / JP | ||
02 /
Tanaka, Toshiharu Fuji Photo Film Co., Ltd. No. 200, Onakazato Fujinomiya-shi Shizuoka / JP | |||
03 /
Shimada, Hirokazu Fuji Photo Film Co., Ltd. No. 200, Onakazato Fujinomiya-shi Shizuoka / JP | Representative(s) | Diamond, Bryan Clive, et al Gee & Co. Chancery House Chancery Lane London WC2A 1QU / GB | [1990/04] | Application number, filing date | 89307418.7 | 20.07.1989 | [1990/04] | Priority number, date | JP19880182678 | 21.07.1988 Original published format: JP 18267888 | [1990/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0352122 | Date: | 24.01.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/04] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0352122 | Date: | 08.08.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0352122 | Date: | 23.03.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.06.1990 | Classification | IPC: | G03C1/52 | [1990/04] | CPC: |
G03C1/52 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | FR, GB [1990/04] | Title | German: | Diazotyp-Material für Wärmeentwicklung | [1990/04] | English: | Heat development type diazo copying material | [1990/04] | French: | Matériel diazo pour le développement par la chaleur | [1990/04] | Examination procedure | 31.12.1990 | Examination requested [1991/10] | 08.12.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.06.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.08.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 24.09.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.12.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 08.12.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.12.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.07.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.07.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]CS140285 ; | [X]DE1805357 (AHLBORN TECH PAPIERE GMBH); | [XD]EP0123224 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD [JP]); | [X]EP0184132 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD [JP]); | [A]US4705736 (NOTLEY NORMAN T [US]) | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 76, no. 24, 12 July 1972 Columbus, Ohio, USA ref. no. 14727R & CS-A-140285 (G.Oldrich)(15-02-1971), & CS140285 A 00000000 | [A] - JOURNAL OF IMAGING TECHNOLOGY. vol. 11, no. 3, June 1985, SPRINGFIELD US pages 137 - 142; Hirotsugu Sato et al.: "UV-Fixable Thermal Recording Paper" |