EP0353922 - A cassette containing flexible tubing to be dispensed therefrom [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.08.1994 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.12.1999 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 26.01.2000 [2000/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PROCESS IMPROVEMENTS (1989) LIMITED Unit J, Albany Park Industrial Estate Camberley, Surrey GU15 2PL / GB | [1993/30] |
Former [1990/06] | For all designated states PROCESS IMPROVEMENTS LIMITED Glendale Park Fernbank Road Ascot Berkshire SL5 8BJ / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Richards, David Charles Birchcroft Sandhurst Road Wokingham Berkshire / GB | 02 /
Williams, Maurice Stanley 74 Cranleigh Mead Cranleigh Surrey / GB | 03 /
Ward, Brian Lokes End Hicks Lane Darby Green Blackwater Surrey / GB | [1990/06] | Representative(s) | Cooke, William Douglas, et al Hughes Clark & Co. P.O. Box 22 114/118 Southampton Row London WC1B 5AA / GB | [1992/23] |
Former [1991/39] | Cooke, William Douglas HUGHES CLARK & CO 114-118 Southampton Row London WC1B 5AA / GB | ||
Former [1990/06] | Cooke, William Douglas Hughes Clark & Co. 114/118 Southampton Row P.O. Box 22 London WC1B 5AA / GB | Application number, filing date | 89307483.1 | 24.07.1989 | [1990/06] | Priority number, date | GB19880018365 | 02.08.1988 Original published format: GB 8818365 | [1990/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0353922 | Date: | 07.02.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0353922 | Date: | 06.10.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.10.1989 | Classification | IPC: | B65B9/15, B65B67/12, B65F1/06 | [1990/06] | CPC: |
B65F1/062 (EP,US);
B65B67/1277 (EP,US);
B65B9/15 (EP,US);
Y10S206/802 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1990/06] | Title | German: | Kassette zum Ausgeben eines darin gespeicherten Folienschlauches | [1990/06] | English: | A cassette containing flexible tubing to be dispensed therefrom | [1990/06] | French: | Cassette pour la distribution et le stockage d'un tuyau souple | [1990/06] | Examination procedure | 24.05.1990 | Examination requested [1990/30] | 10.07.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.08.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.01.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 03.03.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.05.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 26.05.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.07.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.07.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.07.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.07.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 06.10.1993 | BE | 06.10.1993 | CH | 06.10.1993 | GR | 06.10.1993 | LI | 06.10.1993 | NL | 06.10.1993 | SE | 06.10.1993 | [2000/04] |
Former [1994/39] | AT | 06.10.1993 | |
BE | 06.10.1993 | ||
CH | 06.10.1993 | ||
LI | 06.10.1993 | ||
NL | 06.10.1993 | ||
SE | 06.10.1993 | ||
Former [1994/38] | AT | 06.10.1993 | |
BE | 06.10.1993 | ||
CH | 06.10.1993 | ||
LI | 06.10.1993 | ||
SE | 06.10.1993 | ||
Former [1994/32] | AT | 06.10.1993 | |
CH | 06.10.1993 | ||
LI | 06.10.1993 | ||
SE | 06.10.1993 | ||
Former [1994/27] | CH | 06.10.1993 | |
LI | 06.10.1993 | ||
SE | 06.10.1993 | ||
Former [1994/18] | CH | 06.10.1993 | |
LI | 06.10.1993 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3452368 (COUPER JOHN R); | [A]US3938300 (LOVQVIST KARL BO LENNART); | [A]GB2169188 (WOO KYONG IND CO LTD) | Examination | EP0281355 |