Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2620320B | 11.06.1997 | B2 | JPH0245335 | 15.02.1990 | A | Priority number | Date | JP18644988 | 26.07.1988 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2655882B | 24.09.1997 | B2 | JPH0245334 | 15.02.1990 | A | Priority number | Date | JP18644888 | 26.07.1988 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0356011 | Global Dossier | 15.12.1993 | B1 | EP0356011 | 30.05.1990 | A3 | EP0356011 | 28.02.1990 | A2 | Priority number | Date | JP18644988 | 26.07.1988 | JP18644888 | 26.07.1988 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA1309945 | 10.11.1992 | C | Priority number | Date | JP18644988 | 26.07.1988 | JP18644888 | 26.07.1988 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE68911422T | 07.04.1994 | T2 | DE68911422D1 | 27.01.1994 | D1 | Priority number | Date | JP18644988 | 26.07.1988 | JP18644888 | 26.07.1988 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5053196 | 01.10.1991 | A | Priority number | Date | JP18644988 | 26.07.1988 | JP18644888 | 26.07.1988 |