EP0353053 - Catalytic process for producing optically active alpha-hydroxycarboxylates [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.08.1994 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.08.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 12.10.1994 [1994/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Takasago International Corporation 19-22, Takanawa 3-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1990/05] | For all designated states Takasago International Corporation 19-22, Takanawa 3-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mikami, Koichi 11-403, Kominatodanchi, 1-1-2 Kominato-cho Naka-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa / JP | 02 /
Terada, Masahiro 3-7-19, Tamagawakuen Machida-shi Tokyo / JP | 03 /
Nakai, Takeshi 2-23-403, Wakabadai Asahi-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa / JP | 04 /
Sayo, Noboru 1151-127, Kamigou-cho Sakae-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa / JP | 05 /
Kumobayashi, Hidenori 1-4-39, Nakakaigan Chigasaki-shi Kanagawa / JP | [1990/05] | Representative(s) | Diamond, Bryan Clive, et al Gee & Co. Chancery House Chancery Lane London WC2A 1QU / GB | [1990/05] | Application number, filing date | 89307613.3 | 27.07.1989 | [1990/05] | Priority number, date | JP19880189082 | 28.07.1988 Original published format: JP 18908288 | [1990/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0353053 | Date: | 31.01.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/05] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0353053 | Date: | 08.08.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0353053 | Date: | 20.10.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.06.1990 | Classification | IPC: | C07C69/533, C07C67/347, C07C69/732, C07C69/732 | [1990/29] | CPC: |
C07C69/732 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1990/28] | C07C69/533, C07C67/347, C07C67/347, C07C69/732 | ||
Former IPC [1990/05] | C07C69/533 | Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, NL [1990/05] | Title | German: | Katalytisches Verfahren zur Herstellung von optisch-aktiven Alpha-Hydroxycarboxylaten | [1990/05] | English: | Catalytic process for producing optically active alpha-hydroxycarboxylates | [1990/05] | French: | Procédé catalytique pour la production d'alpha-hydroxy carboxylates optiquement actifs | [1990/05] | Examination procedure | 31.12.1990 | Examination requested [1991/10] | 30.11.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 22.01.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.04.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 15.04.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.07.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.07.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.07.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XP] - JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY vol. 111, no. 5, 1st March 1989, pages 1940,1941; KOICHI MIKAMI et al.: "asymmetric Glyoxylate-Ene Reaction Catalyzed by Chiral Titanium Complexes: A Practical Access to alpha-Hydroxy Esters in High Enantiomeric Purities" | [AD] - TETRAHEDRON vol. 42, no. 11, 1986, pages 2993-3001, Pergamon Journals Ltd.; JAMES K. WHITESELL et al.: "Asymmetric Induction in the Ene Reaction of Glyoxylate Esters of 8-Phenylmenthol" | [A] - THE JOURNAL OF ORGANIC CHEMISTRY vol. 44, no. 20, 28th September 1979, pages 3567-3571, American Chemical Society; BARRY B. SNIDER et al.: "Stereochemistry of Ene Reactions of Glyoxylate Esters" | [AP] - TETRAHEDRON LETTERS vol. 29, no 48, 1988, pages 6305-6308, Pergamon Press PLC; KOICHI MIKAMI et al.: "Disastereocontrol via Lewis Acid-Promoted Ene Reaction with Glycoxylates and its Application to Stereocontrolled Synthesis of a 22R-Hydroxy-23-Carboxylate Steroid Side Chain" | [A] - TETRAHEDRON LETTERS vol. 29, no. 32, 1988, pages 3967-3970, Pergamon Press PLC; KAIJA MARUOKA et al.: "Asymmetric Ene Reaction Catalyzed by Chiral Organoaluminum Reagent" | [A] - ACCOUNTS OF CHEMICAL RESEARCH vol. 18, 1985, pages 280-284, American Chemical Society, J. K. WHITESELL: "New Perspectives in Asymmetric Induction" | Examination | - TETRAHEDRON LETTERS, vol. 29, no. 48, 1988, pages 6305-6308, Pergamon Press PLC; KOICHI MIKAMI et al.: "Diastereocontrol via Lewis Acid-Promoted Ene Reaction with Glyoxylates and its Application to Stereocontrolled Synthesis of a 22R-Hydroxy-23-Carboxylate Steroid Side Chain" |