EP0353089 - Thermosetting epoxy resin composition [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.10.1995 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 02.01.2008 [2008/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tonen Corporation 1-1 Hitotsubashi, 1-Chome Chiyoda-Ku Tokyo 100 / JP | [1990/45] |
Former [1990/05] | For all designated states TONEN CORPORATION 1-1, Hitotsubashi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Murakami, Shinkichi 17-34-102, Ttsurugaoka 1-chome Oi-machi Iruma-gun Saitama-ken / JP | 02 /
Watanabe, Osamu 4-3-311, Nishitsurugaoka 1-chome Oi-machi Iruma-gun Saitama-ken / JP | 03 /
Wada, Sadahisa Corpo-Musashino 9-7, Musashino Kamifukuoka-shi Saitama-ken / JP | 04 /
Inoue, Hiroshi 852-77, Kitanagai Miyoshi-machi Iruma-gun Saitama-ken / JP | [1990/05] | Representative(s) | Allam, Peter Clerk, et al Lloyd Wise Commonwealth House, 1-19 New Oxford Street London WC1A 1LW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1990/05] | Allam, Peter Clerk, et al LLOYD WISE, TREGEAR & CO. Norman House 105-109 Strand London WC2R 0AE / GB | Application number, filing date | 89307696.8 | 28.07.1989 | [1990/05] | Priority number, date | JP19880190047 | 29.07.1988 Original published format: JP 19004788 | JP19880190048 | 29.07.1988 Original published format: JP 19004888 | JP19880190049 | 29.07.1988 Original published format: JP 19004988 | [1990/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0353089 | Date: | 31.01.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/05] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0353089 | Date: | 12.06.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0353089 | Date: | 21.12.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.04.1991 | Classification | IPC: | C08G59/24, C08G59/40, C08G59/50 | [1990/05] | CPC: |
C08G59/245 (EP,US);
C08G59/40 (EP,US);
C08G59/5033 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [1990/05] | Title | German: | Hitzehärtbare Epoxidharz-Zusammensetzung | [1990/05] | English: | Thermosetting epoxy resin composition | [1990/05] | French: | Composition de résine époxy thermodurcissable | [1990/05] | Examination procedure | 11.04.1990 | Examination requested [1990/24] | 15.12.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 13.05.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 20.05.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.08.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 16.08.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.09.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.07.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.07.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.07.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.07.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 21.12.1994 | SE | 21.03.1995 | [1999/42] |
Former [1995/42] | SE | 21.03.1995 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP62129308 ; | [E]EP0335706 (TOA NENRYO KOGYO KK [JP]); | [A]US4684678 (SCHULTZ WILLIAM J [US], et al) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 11, no. 357 (C-458)(2804) 20 November 1987, & JP-A-62 129308 (TORAY IND INC) 11 June 1987,, & JP62129308 A 19870611 |