EP0353979 - Phase change ink carrier composition and phase change ink produced therefrom [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.07.1996 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.07.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 04.09.1996 [1996/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TEKTRONIX, INC. Corporate Headquarters, 26600 S.W. Parkway Wilsonville Oregon 97070-1000 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1995/32] | For all designated states TEKTRONIX, INC. Corporate Headquarters, 26600 S.W. Parkway Wilsonville, Oregon 97070-1000 / US | ||
Former [1990/06] | For all designated states TEKTRONIX, INC. Howard Vollum Park, 14150 S.W. Karl Braun Drive Beaverton, Oregon 97005 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Jaeger, Charles Wayne 16151 S.W. DeLine Court Beaverton Oregon 97007 / US | 02 /
Titterington, Donald R. 10185 S.W. Siletz Drive Tualatin Oregon 97062 / US | 03 /
Sopko, Jeffrey J. 815 S.W. Vista No.310 Portland Oregon 97205 / US | 04 /
Le, Hue Phuoc 15171 Brighton Street Westminster California 92683 / US | [1990/06] | Representative(s) | Burke, Steven David, et al R.G.C. Jenkins & Co 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1990/06] | Burke, Steven David, et al R.G.C. Jenkins & Co. 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 89307777.6 | 31.07.1989 | [1990/06] | Priority number, date | US19880227846 | 03.08.1988 Original published format: US 227846 | [1990/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0353979 | Date: | 07.02.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/06] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0353979 | Date: | 02.10.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0353979 | Date: | 13.09.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.08.1991 | Classification | IPC: | C09D11/00 | [1990/06] | CPC: |
C09D11/34 (EP,US);
Y10S260/38 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, IT, NL [1990/06] | Title | German: | Vehikel-Zusammensetzung für Phasenaustausch-Tinte und damit erhaltene Phasenaustausch-Tinte | [1990/06] | English: | Phase change ink carrier composition and phase change ink produced therefrom | [1990/06] | French: | Composition de véhicule d'encre à changement de phase et encre à changement de phase ainsi produite | [1990/06] | Examination procedure | 02.04.1992 | Examination requested [1992/22] | 24.08.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.03.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.04.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.01.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.05.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 15.03.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.06.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 14.06.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.06.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/36] | Request for further processing for: | 23.02.1995 | Request for further processing filed | 23.02.1995 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.06.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.06.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.06.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.06.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.06.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP55054368 ; | [XP]EP0315406 (SEIKO EPSON CORP [JP]); | [E]EP0355342 (TEKTRONIX INC [US]) | [X] - DATABASE WPI, no. 80-40335c, Derwent Publications, London, GB; & JP-A-55 054 368 (CANON) 22-04-1980, & JP55054368 A 00000000 |