EP0354018 - An electrodeposition coating composition and image-forming method using the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.09.1995 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.09.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.11.1995 [1995/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nippon Paint Co., Ltd. 1-2, Oyodokita 2-chome Oyodo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka-fu / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1990/06] | For all designated states NIPPON PAINT CO., LTD. 1-2, Oyodokita 2-chome Oyodo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka-fu / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Seio, Mamoru 1-12-403, Matsugaoka 4-chome Takatsuki-shi Osaka-fu / JP | 02 /
Ikeda, Takeshi 25-1, Kishibekita 4-chome Suita-shi Osaka-fu / JP | 03 /
Nishijima, Kanji 1-5-21, Shime Ibaraki-shi Osaka-fu / JP | 04 /
Ishikawa, Katsukiyo 2-40, Kitadai Sayama Kumiyama-cho Kuze-gun Kyoto-fu / JP | [1990/06] | Representative(s) | Whalley, Kevin, et al Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1990/06] | Whalley, Kevin, et al MARKS & CLERK, 57-60 Lincoln's Inn Fields London WC2A 3LS / GB | Application number, filing date | 89307855.0 | 02.08.1989 | [1990/06] | Priority number, date | JP19880193248 | 02.08.1988 Original published format: JP 19324888 | [1990/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0354018 | Date: | 07.02.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/06] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0354018 | Date: | 22.11.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0354018 | Date: | 09.11.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.10.1990 | Classification | IPC: | G03F7/023, G03F7/16 | [1990/06] | CPC: |
G03F7/164 (EP,US);
G03F7/0233 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [1990/06] | Title | German: | Elektrobeschichtungsverfahren und Bildaufzeichnungsverfahren | [1990/06] | English: | An electrodeposition coating composition and image-forming method using the same | [1990/06] | French: | Composition pour électrocouchage et procédé pour la formation de l'image | [1990/06] | Examination procedure | 17.05.1991 | Examination requested [1991/29] | 08.09.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 21.01.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.04.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 29.04.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.08.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.08.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.08.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.08.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 09.08.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YPD]EP0301101 (NIPPON PAINT CO LTD [JP]); | [YPD]EP0302941 (NIPPON PAINT CO LTD [JP]); | [A]EP0194824 (NIPPON PAINT CO LTD [JP]) |