EP0354024 - Character generation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.05.1996 Database last updated on 03.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.1996 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.07.1996 [1996/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hitachi, Ltd. 6, Kanda Surugadai 4-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1990/06] | For all designated states HITACHI, LTD. 6, Kanda Surugadai 4-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Horiuchi, Yuuichi 2-12-3-2 Kokiubu-cho Hitachi-shi Ibaraki-ken / JP | 02 /
Enomoto, Jyunichi 5-30-14 Higashikanesawa-cho Hitachi-shi Ibaraki-ken / JP | 03 /
Takagishi, Katsufumi 2-1-3 Kokubu-cho Hitachi-shi Ibaraki-ken / JP | [1990/06] | Representative(s) | Calderbank, Thomas Roger, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1990/06] | Calderbank, Thomas Roger, et al MEWBURN ELLIS York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 89307875.8 | 02.08.1989 | [1990/06] | Priority number, date | JP19880194415 | 05.08.1988 Original published format: JP 19441588 | [1990/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0354024 | Date: | 07.02.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/06] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0354024 | Date: | 25.09.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.08.1991 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/12, G06K15/02, G06K15/12 | [1991/43] | CPC: |
G06K15/02 (EP,US);
G06K15/128 (EP,US);
G06K2215/0022 (EP,US);
G06K2215/0045 (EP,US);
G06K2215/0048 (EP,US);
G06K2215/0082 (EP,US);
G06K2215/0085 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [1990/06] | G06F3/12, G06K15/02 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1990/06] | Title | German: | Zeichenerzeugung | [1990/06] | English: | Character generation | [1990/06] | French: | Génération de caractères | [1990/06] | File destroyed: | 20.04.2002 | Examination procedure | 21.09.1989 | Examination requested [1990/06] | 20.10.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.05.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.07.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.01.1996 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1996/28] | 14.02.1996 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1996/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.08.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.08.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.08.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.08.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.08.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP59079388 ; | [A]EP0121126 (IBM [US]); | [A]US4627002 (BLUM DIETRICH [DE], et al); | [A]US4686525 (NAGATA SATOSHI [JP]) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 8, no. 192 (P-298)[1629], 4th September 1984; & JP-A-59 079 388 (TOSHIBA K.K.) 08-05-1984, & JP59079388 A 00000000 |