EP0354031 - Graphical image editing [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.09.1997 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.09.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 05.11.1997 [1997/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Xerox Corporation Xerox Square - 020 Rochester New York 14644 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1990/06] | For all designated states XEROX CORPORATION Xerox Square - 020 Rochester New York 14644 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bier, Eric A. 191 Pine Lane Los Altos California 94022 / US | 02 /
Kurlander, David J. 110 Morningside Drive Apt. No. 55 New York New York 10027 / US | [1990/06] | Representative(s) | Johnson, Reginald George, et al Rank Xerox Ltd Patent Department Parkway Marlow Buckinghamshire SL7 1YL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1995/40] | Johnson, Reginald George, et al Rank Xerox Ltd Patent Department Parkway Marlow Buckinghamshire SL7 1YL / GB | ||
Former [1995/30] | Reynolds, Julian David Rank Xerox Ltd Patent Department Parkway Marlow Buckinghamshire SL7 1YL / GB | ||
Former [1990/06] | Weatherald, Keith Baynes Rank Xerox Ltd Patent Department Parkway Marlow Buckinghamshire SL7 1YL / GB | Application number, filing date | 89307893.1 | 03.08.1989 | [1990/06] | Priority number, date | US19880228882 | 04.08.1988 Original published format: US 228882 | [1990/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0354031 | Date: | 07.02.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/06] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0354031 | Date: | 12.02.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0354031 | Date: | 13.11.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.12.1991 | Classification | IPC: | G06T11/80, G06F17/50, G06K9/64 | [1996/46] | CPC: |
G06T11/00 (EP,US);
G06V10/7515 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1992/07] | G06F15/72, G06K9/64 | ||
Former IPC [1990/06] | G06F15/72 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1990/06] | Title | German: | Graphische Bildaufbereitung | [1990/06] | English: | Graphical image editing | [1990/06] | French: | Edition d'image graphique | [1990/06] | Examination procedure | 05.08.1992 | Examination requested [1992/40] | 28.07.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.01.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.03.1995 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1} | 23.10.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 21.02.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.06.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 03.06.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Appeal following examination | 31.05.1995 | Appeal received | 08.08.1995 | Statement of grounds filed | 22.08.1995 | Interlocutory revision of appeal | Opposition(s) | 14.08.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.06.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.06.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.06.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.06.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.08.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 02.09.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X] - COMPUTER VISION GRAPHICS AND IMAGE PROCESSING. vol. 29, no. 1, January 1985, NEW YORK US pages 37 - 46; D. THALMANN ET AL.: 'Locating, replacing, and deleting patterns in graphics editing of line drawings' |