EP0354733 - Conductive resin structure for connecting metal conductors [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.07.1993 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.04.2002 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 12.06.2002 [2002/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states JUNKOSHA CO. LTD. 25-25, Miyasaka 2-chome Setagaya-ku Tokyo 156 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1990/07] | For all designated states JUNKOSHA CO. LTD. 25-25, Miyasaka 2-chome Setagaya-ku Tokyo 156 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Akiba, Juji 1-27-202, 494 Shimo-Kayama Iruma-gun Saitama / JP | [1990/07] | Representative(s) | Klunker . Schmitt-Nilson . Hirsch Patentanwälte Destouchesstrasse 68 80796 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/40] | Klunker . Schmitt-Nilson . Hirsch Winzererstrasse 106 D-80797 München / DE | ||
Former [1990/07] | Knott, Stephen Gilbert MATHISEN, MACARA & CO. The Coach House 6-8 Swakeleys Road Ickenham Uxbridge Middlesex UB10 8BZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 89307935.0 | 03.08.1989 | [1990/07] | Priority number, date | JP19880105378 | 11.08.1988 Original published format: JP 10537888 | [1990/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0354733 | Date: | 14.02.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/07] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0354733 | Date: | 23.05.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0354733 | Date: | 23.09.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.04.1990 | Classification | IPC: | G01M3/18 | [1990/07] | CPC: |
G01M3/165 (EP,US);
G01N27/12 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1990/07] | Title | German: | Leitfähige Harzstruktur zum Verbinden von Metalleitern | [1992/39] | English: | Conductive resin structure for connecting metal conductors | [1990/07] | French: | Structure à résine conductive pour la connexion de conducteurs métalliques | [1990/07] |
Former [1990/07] | Leistungsfähige Harzstruktur zum Verbinden von Metalleitern | Examination procedure | 22.10.1990 | Examination requested [1990/51] | 13.12.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 09.03.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.06.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 05.06.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.06.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.07.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.07.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 23.09.1992 | BE | 23.09.1992 | CH | 23.09.1992 | ES | 23.09.1992 | GR | 23.09.1992 | LI | 23.09.1992 | NL | 23.09.1992 | [2002/24] |
Former [2000/04] | AT | 23.09.1992 | |
BE | 23.09.1992 | ||
CH | 23.09.1992 | ||
GR | 23.09.1992 | ||
LI | 23.09.1992 | ||
NL | 23.09.1992 | ||
Former [1994/18] | AT | 23.09.1992 | |
BE | 23.09.1992 | ||
CH | 23.09.1992 | ||
LI | 23.09.1992 | ||
NL | 23.09.1992 | ||
Former [1993/21] | BE | 23.09.1992 | |
CH | 23.09.1992 | ||
LI | 23.09.1992 | ||
NL | 23.09.1992 | ||
Former [1993/19] | BE | 23.09.1992 | |
CH | 23.09.1992 | ||
LI | 23.09.1992 | ||
Former [1993/13] | CH | 23.09.1992 | |
LI | 23.09.1992 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE3422394 (JUNKOSHA CO LTD [JP]); | [A]EP0253085 (RAYCHEM CORP [US]) |