EP0412216 - Submersible [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.11.1995 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.11.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 20.12.1995 [1995/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Takimoto, Shohzoh 48, Minato honmachi 1-chome Handa-shi Aichi-ken / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1991/07] | For all designated states Takimoto, Shohzoh 48, Minato honmachi 1-chome Handa-shi Aichi-ken / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1991/07] | Representative(s) | Clifford, Frederick Alan, et al MARKS & CLERK, 57/60 Lincoln's Inn Fields London WC2A 3LS / GB | [1991/07] | Application number, filing date | 89308033.3 | 07.08.1989 | [1991/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0412216 | Date: | 13.02.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0412216 | Date: | 28.12.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.05.1990 | Classification | IPC: | B63G8/14, B63H1/32 | [1991/07] | CPC: |
B63H1/32 (EP,US);
B63G8/14 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1991/07] | Title | German: | Unterseeboot | [1991/07] | English: | Submersible | [1991/07] | French: | Submersible | [1991/07] | Examination procedure | 23.08.1989 | Examination requested [1991/07] | 19.08.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.01.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.03.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.09.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.11.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.04.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.05.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 24.06.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 29.06.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.09.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 21.09.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.09.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.08.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.08.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.08.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 09.08.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | DE | 29.03.1995 | [1995/40] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR449654 (EUGENE LAGARE [FR]); | [X]FR17477E (EUGENE LAGARE [FR]); | [X]US1579109 (HASELEY JONAS J); | [Y]FR2060700 (TAKIMOTO SYOZO); | [A]GB1430295 (WILLIAMS J A); | [A]FR2512773 (GREZE ANDRE [FR]) |