EP0356095 - Synthesis of phosphorus, arsenic and antimony halides and hydrides [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 29.05.1991 Database last updated on 17.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.05.1991 | Withdrawal of application | published on 17.07.1991 [1991/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MORTON INTERNATIONAL, INC. 110 North Wacker Drive Chicago Illinois 60606 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1990/36] | For all designated states MORTON INTERNATIONAL, INC. 110 North Wacker Drive Chicago Illinois 60606 / US | ||
Former [1990/09] | For all designated states MORTON THIOKOL, INC. 110 North Wacker Drive Chicago Illinois 60606-1560 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hui, Benjamin C. 25 Castle Circle Peabody MA 01960 / US | 02 /
Lorberth, Jorg Kiefernweg 3 D-3556 Weimar-Neiderweimar / DE | [1990/09] | Representative(s) | Bankes, Stephen Charles Digby, et al Baron Warren Redfern 1000 Great West Road Brentford TW8 9DW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1990/09] | Bankes, Stephen Charles Digby, et al BARON & WARREN 18 South End Kensington London W8 5BU / GB | Application number, filing date | 89308218.0 | 14.08.1989 | [1990/09] | Priority number, date | US19880232729 | 16.08.1988 Original published format: US 232729 | [1990/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0356095 | Date: | 28.02.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/09] | Classification | IPC: | C07F9/52, C07F9/72, C07F9/90 | [1991/12] | CPC: |
C07F9/72 (EP,US);
C07F9/52 (EP,US);
C07F9/90 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1990/09] | C07F9/72, C07F9/90, C07F9/52 | Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB [1990/09] | Title | German: | Synthese von Phosphor-, Arsen-, und Antimon-Halogeniden und Hydriden | [1990/09] | English: | Synthesis of phosphorus, arsenic and antimony halides and hydrides | [1990/09] | French: | Synthèse d'halogénures et d'hydrures de phosphore, arsenic et antimoine | [1990/09] | File destroyed: | 05.03.1999 | Examination procedure | 14.12.1990 | Examination requested [1991/06] | 25.05.1991 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1991/29] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |