EP0356109 - Electronic inductor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.12.1993 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.12.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.02.1994 [1994/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AT&T Corp. 32 Avenue of the Americas New York, NY 10013-2412 / US | [1990/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Spires, Dewayne Alan 2 Harriman Road Plaistow New Hampshire 03865 / US | [1990/09] | Representative(s) | Buckley, Christopher Simon Thirsk, et al Lucent Technologies (UK) Ltd, 5 Mornington Road Woodford Green Essex IG8 0TU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1990/09] | Buckley, Christopher Simon Thirsk, et al AT&T (UK) LTD., AT&T Intellectual Property Division, 5 Mornington Road Woodford Green, Essex IG8 0TU / GB | Application number, filing date | 89308260.2 | 15.08.1989 | [1990/09] | Priority number, date | US19880234662 | 22.08.1988 Original published format: US 234662 | [1990/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0356109 | Date: | 28.02.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/09] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0356109 | Date: | 19.09.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.07.1990 | Classification | IPC: | H03H11/48 | [1990/09] | CPC: |
H03H11/485 (EP,US);
H01F19/00 (KR);
H03H11/48 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL, SE [1990/09] | Title | German: | Elektronische Induktionsspule | [1990/09] | English: | Electronic inductor | [1990/09] | French: | Bobine d'induction électronique | [1990/09] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 11.12.1990 | Examination requested [1991/08] | 15.04.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.08.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1994/07] | 01.09.1993 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1994/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.08.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.1993 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP53123050 ; | [X]US3474355 (SCHLICHTE MAX) | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 2, no. 154, 25th December 1978, page 9955 E 78; & JP-A-53 123 050 (OKI DENKI KOGYO K.K.) 27-10-1978, & JP53123050 A 00000000 | [Y] - U. TIETZE et al.: "Halbleiter-Schaltungstechnik", 5th edition, 1980, pages 244-245, Springer-Verlag, Berlin, DE |