EP0359410 - Absorbent article with elastic liner for waste material isolation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 24.05.2002 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.10.2005 | Change: Appeal number | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2002/28] | For all designated states THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US | ||
Former [1990/12] | For all designated states THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Freeland, Mary Elaine 4010 S. Madison Norwood Ohio 45212 / US | [1990/12] | Representative(s) | Bottema, Johan Jan, et al Procter & Gamble Service GmbH IP Department Sulzbacher Straße 40-50 65824 Schwalbach am Taunus / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/48] | Bottema, Johan Jan, et al Procter & Gamble GmbH Patent Department Sulzbacher Strasse 40-50 D-65824 Schwalbach am Taunus / DE | ||
Former [1990/12] | Gibson, Tony Nicholas Procter & Gamble (NTC) Limited Whitley Road Longbenton Newcastle upon Tyne NE12 9TS / GB | Application number, filing date | 89308361.8 | 17.08.1989 | [1990/12] | Priority number, date | US19880241165 | 02.09.1988 Original published format: US 241165 | [1990/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0359410 | Date: | 21.03.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0359410 | Date: | 27.04.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/17] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP0359410 | Date: | 10.07.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.01.1990 | Classification | IPC: | A61F13/15 | [1990/12] | CPC: |
A61F13/495 (EP,US);
A61F13/15 (KR);
A61F13/512 (EP,US);
A61F13/58 (EP,US);
A61F2013/51322 (EP,US);
A61F2013/51409 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1990/12] | Title | German: | Saugfähiger Artikel mit elastischem Einsatzstück zur Isolierung von Absonderungen | [1990/12] | English: | Absorbent article with elastic liner for waste material isolation | [1990/12] | French: | Article absorbant avec une couche élastique pour isolation de sécrétions | [1990/12] | Examination procedure | 24.08.1990 | Examination requested [1990/42] | 20.12.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.06.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.10.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.04.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.07.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 29.10.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.01.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 07.01.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
27.01.1995
09.02.1995
ADMISSIBLE Mölnlycke AB S-405 03 Göteborg / SE Opponent's representative Harrison, Michael Charles Albihns GmbH, Bayerstrasse 83 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/12] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
27.01.1995
09.02.1995
ADMISSIBLE Mölnlycke AB S-405 03 Göteborg / SE Opponent's representative Harrison, Michael Charles Albihn West AB, P.O. Box 142 S-401 22 Göteborg / SE | deleted | Deletion: Legal effect of rejection of opposition [ N /P ] | 03.03.1995 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 23.10.1995 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 15.10.1996 | Date of oral proceedings | 05.11.1996 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 05.11.1996 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | 29.03.2001 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 29.03.2001 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 27.07.2001 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 13.10.2001 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Appeal following opposition | 17.12.1996 | Appeal received No. T1115/96 | 17.03.1997 | Statement of grounds filed | 13.06.2000 | Invitation to file observations in an appeal (Time limit: M06) [2000/25] | 16.08.2000 | Date of receipt of observations in an appeal [2000/34] | 19.07.2001 | Interlocutory revision of appeal | 19.07.2001 | Result of appeal procedure: maintenance in amended form | 29.03.2001 | Date of oral proceedings | 06.04.2001 | Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.08.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.08.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.08.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2532029 (MEDOFF LOUIS I); | [A]US3665920 (DAVIS RACHEL D); | [A]CH577281 (VONTOBEL KUNDERT MARLIES); | [A]US4244367 (ROLLENHAGEN JANET T); | [A]WO8605386 (SECR SOCIAL SERVICE BRIT [GB]) |