EP0356260 - Control circuit [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.07.1992 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.1992 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.08.1992 [1992/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MacMillan, Stephen 3 Field Street Beaconsfield Western Australia / AU | [N/P] |
Former [1990/09] | For all designated states MacMillan, Stephen 3 Field Street Beaconsfield Western Australia / AU | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1990/09] | Representative(s) | Cline, Roger Ledlie, et al EDWARD EVANS BARKER Clifford's Inn, Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BZ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1990/09] | Cline, Roger Ledlie, et al EDWARD EVANS & CO. Chancery House 53-64 Chancery Lane London WC2A 1SD / GB | Application number, filing date | 89308678.5 | 25.08.1989 | [1990/09] | Priority number, date | AU19880000072 | 26.08.1988 Original published format: AU 7288 | AU19880004138 | 12.05.1989 Original published format: AU 413888 | [1990/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0356260 | Date: | 28.02.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/09] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0356260 | Date: | 21.08.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.07.1991 | Classification | IPC: | H01H47/00 | [1990/09] | CPC: |
H01H47/001 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1990/09] | Title | German: | Steuerschaltung | [1990/09] | English: | Control circuit | [1990/09] | French: | Circuit de commande | [1990/09] | File destroyed: | 21.02.2000 | Examination procedure | 03.03.1992 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1992/35] | 30.03.1992 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1992/35] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 02.09.1991 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR2583688 ; | [X]EP0071734 ; | [Y]US4546266 |