EP0357372 - Optically active ester derivatives, preparation process thereof, liquid crystal materials and a light switching element [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.09.1995 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.09.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 08.11.1995 [1995/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SUMITOMO CHEMICAL COMPANY, LIMITED 5-33 Kitahama 4-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka-fu / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1990/10] | For all designated states SUMITOMO CHEMICAL COMPANY, LIMITED 5-33 Kitahama 4-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Higashii, Takayuki 4-6, Kamoricho-2-chome Kishiwada-shi / JP | 02 /
Kurimoto, Isao 11-8-108, Sonehigashinocho-2-chome Toyonaka-shi / JP | 03 /
Toda, Shoji 2-40, Hirata-1-chome Ibaraki-Shi / JP | 04 /
Minai, Masayoshi 1606-5, Harimadacho Moriyama-shi / JP | 05 /
Tani, Takeshi 40-1, Kasuga-2-chome Tsukuba-shi / JP | 06 /
Kawakami, Chizu 40-1, Kasuga-2-chome Tsukuba-shi / JP | 07 /
Fujisawa, Koichi 23-7, Namiki-3-chome Tsukuba-shi / JP | 08 /
Imamura, Kiyoshi 16-5, Hattori Honmachi-3-chome Toyonaka-shi / JP | [1990/11] |
Former [1990/10] | 01 /
Higashii, Takayuki 4-6, Kamoricho-2-chome Kishiwada-shi / JP | ||
02 /
Kurimoto, Isao 32-1-8-108, Sonehigashinocho-2-chome Toyonaka-shi / JP | |||
03 /
Toda, Shoji 14-7, Mefu-2-chome Takarazuka-shi / JP | |||
04 /
Minai, Masayoshi 1606-5, Harimadacho Moriyama-shi / JP | |||
05 /
Tani, Takeshi 40-1, Kasuga-2-chome Tsukuba-shi / JP | |||
06 /
Kawakami, Chizu 40-1, Kasuga-2-chome Tsukuba-shi / JP | |||
07 /
Fujisawa, Koichi 23-7, Namiki-3-chome Tsukuba-shi / JP | |||
08 /
Imamura, Kiyoshi 16-5, Hattori Honmachi-3-chome Toyonaka-shi / JP | Representative(s) | Ablewhite, Alan James, et al Marks & Clerk 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1990/10] | Ablewhite, Alan James, et al MARKS & CLERK, 57/60 Lincoln's Inn Fields London WC2A 3LS / GB | Application number, filing date | 89308721.3 | 29.08.1989 | [1990/10] | Priority number, date | JP19880215986 | 29.08.1988 Original published format: JP 21598688 | JP19880217189 | 30.08.1988 Original published format: JP 21718988 | JP19880223853 | 06.09.1988 Original published format: JP 22385388 | JP19880248671 | 29.09.1988 Original published format: JP 24867188 | JP19880249529 | 03.10.1988 Original published format: JP 24952988 | [1990/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0357372 | Date: | 07.03.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/10] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0357372 | Date: | 23.01.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0357372 | Date: | 17.11.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.12.1990 | Classification | IPC: | C07C69/76, C09K19/20, C07C69/63, C07C69/708, C07C69/22, C07C49/84, G02F1/13 | [1990/10] | CPC: |
C07C43/1782 (EP,US);
C07C43/1785 (EP,US);
C07C43/1786 (EP,US);
C07C49/84 (EP,US);
C07C65/21 (EP,US);
C09K19/2021 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, LI [1990/10] | Title | German: | Optisch aktive Ester-Derivate, Verfahren zu ihrer Herstellung, Flüssigkristalline Materialien und ein Lichtschalterelement | [1990/10] | English: | Optically active ester derivatives, preparation process thereof, liquid crystal materials and a light switching element | [1990/10] | French: | Dérivés esters optiquement actifs, leur procédé de préparation, matériaux cristaux liquides et un élément interrupteur de la lumière | [1990/10] | Examination procedure | 28.12.1990 | Examination requested [1991/10] | 06.04.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.10.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.01.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 06.05.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.08.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 12.08.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.08.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.08.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.08.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.07.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]GB2174820 (CANON KK); | [Y]WO8704426 (MERCK PATENT GMBH [DE]); | [XP]EP0294852 (CANON KK [JP]) |