EP0357382 - Screen cylinder and method of manufacture [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 12.11.1991 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.11.1991 | Change - withdrawal | published on 02.01.1992 [1992/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states A. AHLSTROM CORPORATION 29600 Noormarkku / FI | [N/P] |
Former [1990/10] | For all designated states A. AHLSTROM CORPORATION FIN-29600 Noormarkku / FI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lassila, Jouko Eestiläistentie 4 D SF-02270 Espoo / FI | [1990/10] | Representative(s) | Gilmour, David Cedric Franklyn, et al Forresters 15 Hamilton Square Birkenhead Merseyside CH41 6BR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1990/10] | Gilmour, David Cedric Franklyn, et al POTTS, KERR & CO. 15 Hamilton Square Birkenhead Merseyside L41 6BR / GB | Application number, filing date | 89308735.3 | 30.08.1989 | [1990/10] | Priority number, date | FI19880004001 | 31.08.1988 Original published format: FI 884001 | [1990/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0357382 | Date: | 07.03.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/10] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0357382 | Date: | 22.11.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.10.1990 | Classification | IPC: | D21D5/16 | [1990/10] | CPC: |
D21D5/16 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, FR, GB, SE [1990/10] | Title | German: | Siebkorb und Verfahren zu seiner Herstellung | [1990/10] | English: | Screen cylinder and method of manufacture | [1990/10] | French: | Tamis cylindrique et son procédé de fabrication | [1990/10] | File destroyed: | 02.03.1998 | Examination procedure | 25.04.1991 | Examination requested [1991/25] | 31.10.1991 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1992/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.08.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US4264438 |