EP0363003 - Silicon micromachined accelerometer [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.10.1991 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.1991 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.12.1991 [1991/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KEARFOTT GUIDANCE & NAVIGATION CORPORATION 150 Totowa Road CN595 Wayne New Jersey 07474-0595 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1990/15] | For all designated states KEARFOTT GUIDANCE & NAVIGATION CORPORATION 150 Totowa Road CN595 Wayne New Jersey 07474-0595 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Roszhart, Terry Victor 42 Deer Trail Road North Caldwell Essex County New Jersey 07006 / US | [1990/15] | Representative(s) | Wright, Peter David John, et al R.G.C. Jenkins & Co. 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | [1990/15] | Application number, filing date | 89308743.7 | 30.08.1989 | [1990/15] | Priority number, date | US19880238662 | 31.08.1988 Original published format: US 238662 | [1990/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0363003 | Date: | 11.04.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/15] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0363003 | Date: | 26.09.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.08.1990 | Classification | IPC: | G01P15/10, G01P15/13 | [1990/15] | CPC: |
G01P15/13 (EP,US);
G01P15/0802 (EP,US);
G01P15/097 (EP,US);
G01P2015/0828 (EP,US);
Y10S73/01 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1990/15] | Title | German: | Aus Silizium in Mikrotechnologie hergestellter Beschleunigungsmesser | [1990/15] | English: | Silicon micromachined accelerometer | [1990/15] | French: | Accéléromètre micromachiné en silicium | [1990/15] | File destroyed: | 09.03.1999 | Examination procedure | 27.03.1991 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1991/50] | 15.07.1991 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1991/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.07.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 15.05.1991 | M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4766768 (NORLING BRIAN L [US], et al); | [Y]GB2133153 (SUNDSTRAND DATA CONTROL); | [Y]GB2178856 (LITTON SYSTEMS INC); | [A]US4670092 (MOTAMEDI MANOUCHEHR E [US]) |