EP0361698 - Carbon-containing magnetic metal powder [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.04.1994 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2004 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 25.08.2004 [2004/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MITSUBISHI PETROCHEMICAL COMPANY LIMITED 5-2, Marunouchi 2-Chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo-to / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1990/14] | For all designated states MITSUBISHI PETROCHEMICAL COMPANY LIMITED 5-2, Marunouchi 2-Chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo-to / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kageyama, Yoshiteru Mitsubishi Petroch. Comp. Ltd. Shinsozai Kenkyusho 1, Toho-Cho Yokkaichi-Shi Mie-Ken / JP | 02 /
Sawada, Yoshiaki Mitsubishi Petroch. Comp. Ltd. Shinsozai Kenkyusho 1, Toho-Cho Yokkaichi-Shi Mie-Ken / JP | 03 /
Teramoto, Tadashi Mitsubishi Petroch. Comp. Ltd. Shinsozai Kenkyusho 1, Toho-Cho Yokkaichi-Shi Mie-Ken / JP | [1990/14] | Representative(s) | Kyle, Diana, et al Elkington and Fife LLP Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1990/14] | Kyle, Diana, et al Elkington and Fife Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | Application number, filing date | 89308872.4 | 01.09.1989 | [1990/14] | Priority number, date | JP19880221952 | 05.09.1988 Original published format: JP 22195288 | JP19880252639 | 06.10.1988 Original published format: JP 25263988 | [1990/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0361698 | Date: | 04.04.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0361698 | Date: | 23.06.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.12.1989 | Classification | IPC: | H01F1/047 | [1990/14] | CPC: |
H01F1/06 (EP,US);
G11B5/70605 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [1990/14] | Title | German: | Magnetisches Pulvermetall mit Kohlenstoff | [1990/14] | English: | Carbon-containing magnetic metal powder | [1990/14] | French: | Poudre de métal magnétique contenant du carbone | [1990/14] | Examination procedure | 27.02.1990 | Examination requested [1990/17] | 23.03.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.07.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.09.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 15.12.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.02.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 16.02.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.03.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.09.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.09.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 23.06.1993 | NL | 23.06.1993 | GB | 23.09.1993 | [2004/35] |
Former [1994/49] | NL | 23.06.1993 | |
GB | 23.09.1993 | ||
FR | 12.11.1993 | ||
Former [1994/24] | NL | 23.06.1993 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]JPH05231809 (NIPPON DENSHI KOGYO KK); | [AD]US2983997 (ARNOLD SCHMECKENBECHER); | [AD]US2884319 (FABIAN ROBERT W, et al); | [A]JPH06216237 (TOSHIBA CORP); | [A]JPH05248581 (NIPPON PISCO KK) |