EP0363013 - Thermally engaged centrifugal clutch [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.08.1993 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.08.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.09.1993 [1993/38] | Applicant(s) | For:GB
Ford Motor Company Limited Eagle Way Brentwood Essex CM13 3BW / GB | For:DE
FORD-WERKE AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Henry-Ford-Strasse 1 50725 Köln / DE | For:FR
FORD FRANCE S.A. B.P. 307 92506 Rueil-Malmaison Cédex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1990/15] | For:GB
FORD MOTOR COMPANY LIMITED Eagle Way Brentwood, Essex CM13 3BW / GB | ||
For:DE
FORD-WERKE AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT D-50725 Köln / DE | |||
For:FR
FORD FRANCE S. A. B.P. 307 F-92506 Rueil-Malmaison Cédex / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Diehl, Roy Edward 19955 Woodhill Northville Michigan 48167 / US | 02 /
Berger, Alvin Harry 18924 Emit Brownstone Michigan 48192 / US | [1990/15] | Representative(s) | Messulam, Alec Moses, et al Harrison IP Limited 3 Ebor House London Ebor Business Park Millfield Lane Nether Poppleton York YO26 6QY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1990/15] | Messulam, Alec Moses, et al A. Messulam & Co. 24 Broadway Leigh on Sea Essex SS9 1BN / GB | Application number, filing date | 89308952.4 | 05.09.1989 | [1990/15] | Priority number, date | US19880253825 | 05.10.1988 Original published format: US 253825 | [1990/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0363013 | Date: | 11.04.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.02.1990 | Classification | IPC: | F16D43/18, F16D43/25 | [1990/15] | CPC: |
F16D43/18 (EP,US);
F16D43/25 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1990/15] | Title | German: | Temperaturgesteuerte Fliehkraftkupplung | [1990/15] | English: | Thermally engaged centrifugal clutch | [1990/15] | French: | Embrayage centrifuge à commande thermique | [1990/15] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 21.09.1990 | Examination requested [1990/46] | 03.03.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.07.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.01.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 01.04.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1993/38] | 28.04.1993 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1993/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.08.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.1992 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2972398 (DAVIS FREDERICK L); | [X]FR1538916 ; | [Y]GB2008207 (BORG WARNER); | [Y]FR15595E (PAUL MARIE HELIOT [FR]); | [Y]US2506520 (SPASE CHARLES B); | [X]DE1808505 (METALLGESELLSCHAFT AG); | [Y]DE2005387 |