EP0358476 - Integrated optic components [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.05.1999 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.07.2004 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): LU | published on 15.09.2004 [2004/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Akzo Nobel N.V. Velperweg 76 6824 BM Arnhem / NL | For all designated states Koninklijke KPN N.V. Stationsplein 7 9726 AE Groningen / NL | [1998/49] |
Former [1998/30] | For all designated states Akzo Nobel N.V. Velperweg 76 6824 BM Arnhem / NL | ||
For all designated states Koninklijke PTT Nederland N.V. P.O. Box 95321 2509 CH Den Haag / NL | |||
Former [1995/46] | For all designated states Akzo Nobel N.V. Velperweg 76 NL-6824 BM Arnhem / NL | ||
For all designated states Koninklijke PTT Nederland N.V. Stationsweg 10 NL-9726 AC Groningen / NL | |||
Former [1995/40] | For all designated states ABB Flexible Automation GmbH Schorbachstrasse 9 D-35510 Butzbach / DE | ||
For all designated states Akzo Nobel N.V. Velperweg 76 NL-6824 BM Arnhem / NL | |||
For all designated states Koninklijke PTT Nederland N.V. Stationsweg 10 NL-9726 AC Groningen / NL | |||
Former [1994/20] | For all designated states BARR & STROUD LIMITED Caxton Street Anniesland Glasgow Scotland G13 1HZ / GB | ||
For all designated states Akzo Nobel N.V. Velperweg 76 NL-6824 BM Arnhem / NL | |||
For all designated states Koninklijke PTT Nederland N.V. Stationsweg 10 NL-9726 AC Groningen / NL | |||
Former [1990/11] | For all designated states BARR & STROUD LIMITED Caxton Street Anniesland Glasgow Scotland G13 1HZ / GB | ||
For all designated states AKZO N.V. Velperweg 76 NL-6824 BM Arnhem / NL | |||
For all designated states Koninklijke PTT Nederland N.V. Stationsweg 10 NL-9726 AC Groningen / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Horsthuis, Winfried Henri Gerard Noorderstraat 7 NL-6953 CD Dieren / NL | 02 /
Diemeer, Martinus Bernardus Johannes Schapenweide 41 NL-2727 HX Zoetermeer / NL | 03 /
McDonach, Alaster 45 Beechwood Drive Broomhill Glasgow G11 7EM Scotland / GB | 04 /
Copeland, John Martin 320 Crow Road Glasgow G11 7HS Scotland / GB | [1990/11] | Representative(s) | Kraak, Hajo, et al Akzo Nobel N.V. Patent Department P.O. Box 9300 6800 SB Arnhem / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1995/46] | Kraak, Hajo, et al Akzo Nobel N.V. Patent Department (Dept. APTA) P.O. Box 9300 NL-6800 SB Arnhem / NL | ||
Former [1995/40] | Brekelmans, Paul Johan Gérard Akzo Nobel N.V. Patent Department P.O. Box 9300 NL-6800 SB Arnhem / NL | ||
Former [1995/18] | Schalkwijk, Pieter Cornelis, c.s. AKZO NOBEL N.V., Patent Department (Dept. APTA), Velperweg 76 NL-6824 BM Arnhem / NL | ||
Former [1990/11] | MacDougall, Donald Carmichael Cruikshank & Fairweather 19 Royal Exchange Square Glasgow G1 3AE, Scotland / GB | Application number, filing date | 89309013.4 | 06.09.1989 | [1990/11] | Priority number, date | GB19880021119 | 08.09.1988 Original published format: GB 8821119 | GB19890006818 | 23.03.1989 Original published format: GB 8906818 | [1990/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0358476 | Date: | 14.03.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/11] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0358476 | Date: | 27.11.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0358476 | Date: | 22.07.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.10.1991 | Classification | IPC: | G03F7/00, G02B6/12 | [1990/11] | CPC: |
G02F1/065 (EP,US);
H01L33/00 (KR);
G02B6/1221 (EP,US);
G03F7/001 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1990/11] | Title | German: | Integrierte optische Bauteile | [1998/30] | English: | Integrated optic components | [1990/11] | French: | Systèmes optiques intégrés | [1990/11] |
Former [1990/11] | Integrierte optische Bestandteile | Examination procedure | 30.04.1992 | Examination requested [1992/27] | 25.01.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.08.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.10.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.03.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.08.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.02.1997 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 10.02.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.09.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 05.01.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.03.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 27.03.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.04.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/28] | Request for further processing for: | 10.02.1997 | Request for further processing filed | 10.02.1997 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 04.03.1997 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.09.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.09.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.09.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.09.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.07.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 01.08.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.07.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 22.07.1998 | BE | 22.07.1998 | CH | 22.07.1998 | ES | 22.07.1998 | GR | 22.07.1998 | LI | 22.07.1998 | LU | 06.09.1998 | [2004/38] |
Former [2002/24] | AT | 22.07.1998 | |
BE | 22.07.1998 | ||
CH | 22.07.1998 | ||
ES | 22.07.1998 | ||
GR | 22.07.1998 | ||
LI | 22.07.1998 | ||
LU | 30.09.1998 | ||
Former [2000/52] | AT | 22.07.1998 | |
BE | 22.07.1998 | ||
CH | 22.07.1998 | ||
GR | 22.07.1998 | ||
LI | 22.07.1998 | ||
LU | 30.09.1998 | ||
Former [2000/50] | AT | 22.07.1998 | |
BE | 22.07.1998 | ||
GR | 22.07.1998 | ||
LU | 30.09.1998 | ||
CH | 27.10.1998 | ||
LI | 27.10.1998 | ||
Former [2000/04] | AT | 22.07.1998 | |
BE | 22.07.1998 | ||
GR | 22.07.1998 | ||
LU | 30.09.1998 | ||
Former [1999/27] | AT | 22.07.1998 | |
BE | 22.07.1998 | ||
Former [1999/22] | AT | 22.07.1998 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE3704878 (MERCK PATENT GMBH [DE]); | [XP]EP0290061 (AKZO NV [NL]); | [XP]EP0313476 (EASTMAN KODAK CO [US]); | [E]EP0334176 (HOECHST CELANESE CORP [US]); | [E]EP0350112 (AKZO NV [NL]); | [E]EP0350113 (AKZO NV [NL]); | [E]EP0351832 (CANON KK [JP]) |