EP0358478 - Multi-channel remote control transmitter [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.12.1991 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.12.1991 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.02.1992 [1992/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CLIFFORD ELECTRONICS, INC. 20750 Lassen Street Chatsworth California 91311 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1990/11] | For all designated states CLIFFORD ELECTRONICS, INC. 20750 Lassen Street Chatsworth California 91311 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Drori, Ze'ev 20750 Lassen Street Chatsworth California 91311 / US | 02 /
Segal, Moti 20624 Romar Street Chatsworth California 91311 / US | [1990/11] | Representative(s) | Jackson, David Spence, et al Reddie & Grose LLP 16 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1990/11] | Jackson, David Spence, et al REDDIE & GROSE 16, Theobalds Road London, WC1X 8PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 89309015.9 | 06.09.1989 | [1990/11] | Priority number, date | US19880243080 | 09.09.1988 Original published format: US 243080 | [1990/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0358478 | Date: | 14.03.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/11] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0358478 | Date: | 28.11.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.10.1990 | Classification | IPC: | G08C19/28, E05B49/00 | [1990/11] | CPC: |
G07C9/00182 (EP,US);
G08C19/28 (EP,US);
G07C2009/0023 (EP,US);
G07C2009/00238 (EP,US);
G07C2009/00793 (EP,US);
G07C2009/00928 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1990/11] | Title | German: | Vielfachkanal-Fernsteurungssender | [1990/11] | English: | Multi-channel remote control transmitter | [1990/11] | French: | Emetteur de commande à distance multi-canaux | [1990/11] | File destroyed: | 15.03.1999 | Examination procedure | 29.05.1991 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1992/07] | 09.09.1991 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1992/07] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 08.07.1991 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.1991 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0268238 (GG ELECTRONICS LTD [IL]); | [Y]US4303911 (HULICK TIMOTHY P); | [Y]FR2608299 (TURATTI MARIO [IT]); | [Y]EP0037238 (JOHNS PERRY IND LTD [AU]); | [Y]US4245347 (HUTTON THOMAS J, et al) |