EP0358484 - Process for preparation of 1-benzylimidazole compound, and its compound [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1990/11] | Process for preparation of 1-benzylimidazole compound, and novel compound | ||
[1994/28] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.05.1995 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.05.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 05.07.1995 [1995/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SHIKOKU CHEMICALS CORPORATION 147-1-Minato-machi Marugame-shi Kagawa-ken / JP | [1990/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sawa, Natsuo 5-27, Wakaba-cho Tadotsu-cho Nakatado-gun Kagawa-ken / JP | 02 /
Masuda, Takeshi 8-15, Kitahirayama-cho 2-chome Marugame-shi Kagawa-ken / JP | 03 /
Miura, Shozo 704, Oaza Yoshizuotsu Mino-cho Mitoyo-gun Kagawa-ken / JP | 04 /
Kano, Naoki 4-8, Joto-cho 1-chome Marugame-shi Kagawa-ken / JP | 05 /
Kamagata, Kazuo 1515-473, Ishizaka Hatoyama-cho Hiki-gun Saitama-ken / JP | 06 /
Ito, Masayuki 1-8, Shimizu Sakado-shi Saitama-ken / JP | [1990/11] | Representative(s) | Cresswell, Thomas Anthony, et al J.A. Kemp & Co. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1990/11] | Cresswell, Thomas Anthony, et al J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | Application number, filing date | 89309024.1 | 06.09.1989 | [1990/11] | Priority number, date | JP19880224127 | 06.09.1988 Original published format: JP 22412788 | JP19890048943 | 28.02.1989 Original published format: JP 4894389 | [1990/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0358484 | Date: | 14.03.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/11] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0358484 | Date: | 04.09.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0358484 | Date: | 13.07.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.07.1991 | Classification | IPC: | C07D233/60, C08G59/50, C07D233/64 | [1991/35] | CPC: |
C07D233/64 (EP,US);
C07D233/58 (KR);
C07D231/12 (EP,US);
C07D233/56 (EP,US);
C07D249/08 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1990/11] | C07D233/58, C08G59/50 | Designated contracting states | CH, DE, GB, LI [1990/11] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von 1-Benzylimidazol und dessen Verbindung | [1990/11] | English: | Process for preparation of 1-benzylimidazole compound, and its compound | [1994/28] | French: | Procédé de préparation de 1-benzylimidazole et son composé | [1990/11] |
Former [1990/11] | Process for preparation of 1-benzylimidazole compound, and novel compound | Examination procedure | 10.01.1992 | Examination requested [1992/11] | 06.04.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.08.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.10.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 14.01.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.04.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 05.04.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.04.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.09.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.09.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.09.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A] - JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, vol. 18, nr. 8, August 1975, pages 833-836, Washington, US; K.H. BAGGALEY et al.: "Hypolipidemic imidazoles." | [AD] - RECUEIL DES TRAVAUX CHIMIQUES DES PAYS-BAS, vol. 91, 1972, pages 1383-1392, Den Haag NL; E.F. GODEFROI et al.: "Synthesis of 1,2-disubstituted imidazole-5-carboxaldehydes and -4,5- dicarboxaldehydes" | [E] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 113, nr. 9, 27th August 1990, page 785, column 2, abstract nr. 78398g, Columbus, Ohio, US; N. SAWA et al.: "Preparation of 1-benzylilmidazoles as epoxy resin hardeners." |