EP0361709 - Improved abradable coating and its production [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.08.1994 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.08.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 12.10.1994 [1994/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PLASMA-TECHNIK AG Rigackerstrasse 21 5610 Wohlen 1 / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1993/26] | For all designated states PLASMA-TECHNIK AG Rigackerstrasse 21 CH-5610 Wohlen 1 / CH | ||
Former [1990/14] | For all designated states SULZER PLASMA TECHNIK, INC. 1972 Meijer Drive Troy Michigan 48084 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Marantz, Daniel R. 25 Cedar Lane Sans Point, NY 11050 / US | 02 /
Rangaswamy, Subramaniam 348 Oxhead Road Stony Brook, NY 11790 / US | 03 /
Miller, Robert Alvin 14110 Balfour Avenue Oak Park, MI 48237 / US | [1993/42] |
Former [1990/14] | 01 /
Marantz, Daniel R. 25 Cedar Lane Sands Point New York 11050 / US | ||
02 /
Rangaswamy, Subramaniam 348 Oxhead Road Stony Brook New York 11790 / US | |||
03 /
Miller, Robert Alvin 14110 Balfour Avenue Oak Park Michigan 48237 / US | Representative(s) | Rottmann, Maximilian Rottmann, Zimmermann + Partner AG Gartenstrasse 28 A 5400 Baden / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1993/28] | Rottmann, Maximilian R. c/o Rottmann, Zimmermann + Partner AG Glattalstrasse 37 CH-8052 Zürich / CH | ||
Former [1990/14] | Gore, Peter Manson W.P. THOMPSON & CO. Coopers Building Church Street Liverpool L1 3AB / GB | Application number, filing date | 89309077.9 | 07.09.1989 | [1990/14] | Priority number, date | US19880247024 | 20.09.1988 Original published format: US 247024 | US19890326775 | 21.03.1989 Original published format: US 326775 | [1990/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0361709 | Date: | 04.04.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0361709 | Date: | 20.10.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.02.1990 | Classification | IPC: | C23C4/12, B05B7/20, B05B7/22 | [1990/14] | CPC: |
B05B7/226 (EP);
C23C4/04 (KR);
B05B7/203 (EP);
B05B7/205 (EP);
B05B7/224 (EP);
C23C4/129 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1990/14] | Title | German: | Verschleissfeste Beschichtung und Verfahren zu ihrer Herstellung | [1990/14] | English: | Improved abradable coating and its production | [1990/14] | French: | Revêtement résistant et procédé pour sa fabrication | [1990/14] | Examination procedure | 06.07.1990 | Examination requested [1990/36] | 26.11.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.05.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.07.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.09.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.10.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 22.04.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.07.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 17.07.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.07.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.09.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.09.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.08.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 20.10.1993 | BE | 20.10.1993 | CH | 20.10.1993 | LI | 20.10.1993 | NL | 20.10.1993 | [1994/39] |
Former [1994/38] | AT | 20.10.1993 | |
BE | 20.10.1993 | ||
CH | 20.10.1993 | ||
LI | 20.10.1993 | ||
Former [1994/32] | AT | 20.10.1993 | |
CH | 20.10.1993 | ||
LI | 20.10.1993 | ||
Former [1994/18] | CH | 20.10.1993 | |
LI | 20.10.1993 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP63121648 ; | [A]JP63137154 ; | [A]JP6247441 ; | [X]FR516567 (METALLISATION SOC D [FR]); | [A]FR1434948 (SFEC); | [A]US3723165 (LONGO F, et al); | [A]WO8301751 (UNITED TECHNOLOGIES CORP [US]); | [A]EP0118249 (TATEHO KAGAKU KOGYO KK [JP]); | [A]EP0232919 (TSUNEKAWA YOSHIYUKI [JP], et al); | [A]EP0282310 (BROWNING JAMES A) | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 12, no. 372 (C-533)[3219], 5th October 1988; & JP-A-63 121 648 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP.) 25-05-1988, & JP63121648 A 00000000 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 12, no. 391 (C-537)[3238], 18th October 1988; & JP-A-63 137 154 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP.) 09-06-1988, & JP63137154 A 00000000 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 11, no. 232 (C-437)[2679], 29th July 1987; & JP-A-62 47 441 (TOSHIBA CORP.) 02-03-1987, & JP6247441 A 00000000 | Examination | JP63121648 | - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 12, no. 372 (C-533)[3219], 05 October 1988; & JP-A-63 121 648, & JP63121648 A 19881005 |