EP0416181 - Paper-holding writing instrument [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.08.1993 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.07.2009 | Change - representative | published on 02.09.2009 [2009/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Chang, Shi-Lung 2F, No. 82, Chien-Kuo N. Road, Sec. 3 Taipei / TW | [N/P] |
Former [1991/11] | For all designated states Chang, Shi-Lung 2F, No. 82, Chien-Kuo N. Road, Sec. 3 Taipei / TW | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1991/11] | Representative(s) | Paget, Hugh Charles Edward, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/36] | Paget, Hugh Charles Edward, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP 33 Gutter Lane London EC2V 8AS / GB | ||
Former [1991/11] | Paget, Hugh Charles Edward, et al MEWBURN ELLIS 2 Cursitor Street London EC4A 1BQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 89309126.4 | 08.09.1989 | [1991/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0416181 | Date: | 13.03.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.05.1990 | Classification | IPC: | B43K29/12 | [1991/11] | CPC: |
B43K29/12 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1991/11] | Title | German: | Schreibgerät mit Papiervorrat | [1991/11] | English: | Paper-holding writing instrument | [1991/11] | French: | Instrument à écrire contenant du papier | [1991/11] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 25.11.1991 | Examination requested [1992/04] | 01.04.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1993/39] | 28.04.1993 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1993/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.01.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 22.10.1991 | M01   Fee paid on   25.11.1991 | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.1991 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   23.01.1992 | 30.09.1992 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US1545399 (CLENNAN HOWARD J); | [A]DE451884 (EDITH MARY BOLTON GEB HART); | [A]DE453966 (GUSTAV HUEBNER); | [AD]US2512168 (MOORE ROBERT C); | [A]US2732817 ; | [A]US3963358 (HOUSER ROY W) |