EP0359556 - Dual diaphragm apparatus with diaphragm assembly and rupture detection methods [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.03.1991 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.03.1991 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.05.1991 [1991/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NORDSON CORPORATION 28601 Clemens Road Westlake, Ohio 44145-1148 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1990/12] | For all designated states NORDSON CORPORATION 28601 Clemens Road Westlake Ohio 44145-1148 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wacker L. Robert 125 Pleasant Street Wellington, Ohio / US | 02 /
Kennon James 125 Orchard Hill Drive Amherst, Ohio / US | 03 /
Becker Kevin C. 25030 Maple Ridge Road Westlake Ohio / US | 04 /
Lader Harry J. 2379 Woodward Avenue Lakewood, Ohio / US | 05 /
Rehman William R. 7802 Core Orphanage Road Vermilion. Ohio / US | [1990/12] | Representative(s) | Allen, Oliver John Richard, et al Lloyd Wise, Tregear & Co., Commonwealth House, 1-19 New Oxford Street London WC1A 1LW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1990/12] | Allen, Oliver John Richard, et al Lloyd Wise, Tregear & Co. Norman House 105-109 Strand London, WC2R 0AE / GB | Application number, filing date | 89309312.0 | 13.09.1989 | [1990/12] | Priority number, date | US19880243802 | 13.09.1988 Original published format: US 243802 | [1990/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0359556 | Date: | 21.03.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.12.1989 | Classification | IPC: | F04B43/00 | [1990/12] | CPC: |
F04B43/009 (EP,US);
G01N27/10 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1990/12] | Title | German: | Doppelmembranvorrichtung mit Membranmontier- und Bruchdetektierverfahren | [1990/12] | English: | Dual diaphragm apparatus with diaphragm assembly and rupture detection methods | [1990/12] | French: | Dispositif à deux membranes avec méthode de montage de membrane et de détection de rupture | [1990/12] | File destroyed: | 04.03.1999 | Examination procedure | 22.09.1990 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1991/19] | 11.12.1990 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1991/19] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | DE2624129 [ ] (RING); | DE1403804 [ ] (SIEMENS AG); | US2323950 [ ] (WADE JOHN B); | US3431823 [ ] (ORLITA FRANZ); | US3775030 [ ] (WANNER W) |