EP0359585 - Turbine blade repair [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.04.1996 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.04.2002 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 12.06.2002 [2002/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states REFURBISHED TURBINE COMPONENTS LIMITED George Bayliss Road Droitwich Hereford and Worcester WR9 9AB / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1990/12] | For all designated states REFURBISHED TURBINE COMPONENTS LIMITED George Bayliss Road Droitwich Hereford and Worcester WR9 9AB / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fraser, Michael James The Hop Kilns Broughton Hackett Worcestershire, WR7 4NA / GB | 02 /
Legros, Raymond Donald 2 Bramley Avenue Henwick Park Worcester, WR2 6DG / GB | [1990/12] | Representative(s) | Symes, Christopher Anthony, et al Forrester & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/12] | Symes, Christopher A., et al FORRESTER & BOEHMERT Franz-Joseph-Strasse 38 D-80801 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 89309407.8 | 15.09.1989 | [1990/12] | Priority number, date | GB19880021766 | 16.09.1988 Original published format: GB 8821766 | GB19880026019 | 07.11.1988 Original published format: GB 8826019 | [1990/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0359585 | Date: | 21.03.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0359585 | Date: | 21.06.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.12.1989 | Classification | IPC: | B23P6/00, B23P15/02 | [1990/12] | CPC: |
B23P6/002 (EP,US);
B23K37/0443 (EP,US);
F01D5/005 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49318 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49336 (EP,US);
Y10T29/4975 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1990/12] | Title | German: | Reparatur einer Turbinenschaufel | [1990/12] | English: | Turbine blade repair | [1990/12] | French: | Réparation d'une aube de turbine | [1990/12] | Examination procedure | 07.09.1990 | Examination requested [1990/44] | 16.01.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.07.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.11.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.05.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.09.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.03.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.08.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 07.12.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 14.12.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.03.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 17.03.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.03.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.10.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.09.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.09.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.09.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.1991 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   28.10.1991 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 21.06.1995 | GR | 21.06.1995 | SE | 21.09.1995 | [2002/24] |
Former [2000/04] | GR | 21.06.1995 | |
SE | 21.09.1995 | ||
Former [1996/04] | SE | 21.09.1995 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE2328786 (ZEISE THEODOR FA); | [A]US4058880 (HUGHEY EMERSON DEE); | [A]US4373241 (MALOOF RALPH P [US]); | [YD]GB2124126 (REFURBISHED TURBINE COMPONENTS) | [A] - DUBBEL Taschenbuch fÙr Maschinenbau, edition 14, 1981, chapter G 112, Schwei barkeit der Werkstoffe SPRINGER VERLAG, Berlin, Heidelberg, New York page 352, right column, lines 7-9; fig. 3b |