EP0377272 - Use of nalmefene or naltrexone in the treatment of arthritic and inflammatory diseases [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 04.05.1994 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.05.1994 | Refusal of application | published on 22.06.1994 [1994/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BAKER NORTON PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. 8800 N.W. 36th Street Miami Florida 33166 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1993/01] | For all designated states BAKER NORTON PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. 8800 N.W. 36th Street Miami Florida 33166 / US | ||
Former [1990/28] | For all designated states BAKER CUMMINS PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. 8800 N.W. 36th Street Miami Florida 33178 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Atkinson, David C. 8510 Northwest 7th Court Pembroke Pines Florida 33024 / US | 02 /
Fishman, Jack 10900 Snapper Creek Road Miami Florida 33156 / US | 03 /
Sherman, Fred P. 3651 N. 33rd Terrace Hollywood Florida 33021 / US | [1990/28] | Representative(s) | Ritter, Stephen David, et al Mathys & Squire LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2SQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1990/28] | Ritter, Stephen David, et al Mathys & Squire 100 Grays Inn Road London WC1X 8AL / GB | Application number, filing date | 89309448.2 | 18.09.1989 | [1990/28] | Priority number, date | US19890293196 | 04.01.1989 Original published format: US 293196 | [1990/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0377272 | Date: | 11.07.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/28] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0377272 | Date: | 25.09.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.08.1991 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/485 | [1990/28] | CPC: |
A61K31/485 (EP,US);
A61P29/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1990/28] | Title | German: | Verwendung von Nalmefin oder Naltrexon zur Behandlung der Arthritis und entzündlicher Erkrankungen | [1990/28] | English: | Use of nalmefene or naltrexone in the treatment of arthritic and inflammatory diseases | [1990/28] | French: | Utilisation de nalméfène ou naltrexone pour le traitement de l'arthrite et des maladies inflammatoires | [1990/28] | Examination procedure | 23.10.1991 | Examination requested [1991/51] | 20.07.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.01.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.02.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.06.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.08.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 18.01.1994 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [1994/25] | 28.01.1994 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1994/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.09.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.09.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.09.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | EP0035856 [ ] (EFAMOL LTD [GB]); | WO8805297 [ ] (SHELLY MARC YVES FRANCK CLEMEN [FR]); | US4857533 [ ] (SHERMAN FRED P [US], et al) | [ ] - Research Communications in Substances of Abuse, Vol. 4, No. 3, 1983, pages 227-237, reserved by PJD Publiations Ltd, US; S. FUERST et al.: "Does naloxone influence prostaglandin synthesis through inhibitory effect of naloxone on malondialdehyde formation from experimentally induced inflammatory exsudatum", page 227, Abstract; page 228, 1st paragraph; page 231, 1st paragraph; page 231 "Discussion", lines 1-4; page 232, last paragraph - page 233, 2nd paragraph included page 234, last sentence. | [ ] - Life Sciences, Vol. 37, 1985, pages 1381-1386, US; C.O. SIMPKINS et al.: "Naloxone inhibits superoxide release from human neutrophils", page 1381, summary; page 1385 "Discussion". | [ ] - European Journal of Pharmacology, Vol. 96, Nos. 3/4, 23rd December 1983, pages 277-283, Elsevier Science Publishers B.V.; L. RIOS et al.: "Local inhibition of inflammatory pain by naloxone and its N-methyl quaternary analogue", page 277, Abstract; pages 277-278, left-hand column, 1st paragraph: "Introduction"; page 280, right-hand column; page 282, end: "Discussion". | [ ] - Proceedings of the Vth World Congress on Pain, 1988, pages 72-79, Elsevier Science Publishers BV, NL; V. KAYSER et al.: "Paradoxical effects of low doses of morphine and naloxone in models of persistent pain (arthritic rats)", page 72, summary; page 72, right-hand column - page 73, left-hand column, 1st paragraph: "Introduction"; page 76, right-hand column, last paragraph - page 79, end. | [ ] - Clinics in Laboratory Medicine, Vol. 8, No. 2, June 1988, pages 269-276, US; L.H. CALABRESE: "Autoimmune manifestations of human immunodeficiency virus (HIV) infection", page 270, last paragraph; page 276, last paragraph - page 277 "Summary". |