EP0361751 - Passive optical device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.11.1995 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.11.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 20.12.1995 [1995/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AT&T Corp. 32 Avenue of the Americas New York, NY 10013-2412 / US | [1990/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Blyler, Lee L. 55 Kensington Road Basking Ridge New Jersey 07920 / US | 02 /
Grimes, Gary J. 4120 East 115 Place Thornton Colorado 80233 / US | [1990/14] | Representative(s) | Johnston, Kenneth Graham, et al Lucent Technologies EUR-IP UK Ltd Unit 18, Core 3 Workzone Innova Business Park Electric Avenue Enfield, EN3 7XB / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1990/14] | Johnston, Kenneth Graham, et al AT&T (UK) LTD. AT&T Intellectual Property Division 5 Mornington Road Woodford Green Essex, IG8 OTU / GB | Application number, filing date | 89309478.9 | 19.09.1989 | [1990/14] | Priority number, date | US19880252091 | 30.09.1988 Original published format: US 252091 | [1990/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0361751 | Date: | 04.04.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/14] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0361751 | Date: | 31.07.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0361751 | Date: | 28.12.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.06.1991 | Classification | IPC: | G02B6/28, B29D11/00 | [1990/14] | CPC: |
G02B6/43 (EP,US);
G02B6/2808 (EP,US);
G02B6/4296 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, NL, SE [1990/14] | Title | German: | Passives optisches Bauelement | [1990/14] | English: | Passive optical device | [1990/14] | French: | Elément optique passif | [1990/14] | Examination procedure | 22.01.1992 | Examination requested [1992/13] | 06.07.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.01.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.02.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 27.06.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.09.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 09.09.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.09.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.09.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.09.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.09.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.09.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP60029710 ; | [A]JP60024505 ; | [A]US4198118 (PORTER DAVID R [US]) | [A] - APPLIED OPTICS, vol. 21, no. 11, June 1982, pages 1940-1942; N. TAKATO et al.: "Polymer waveguide star coupler" | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 9, no. 151 (P-367)[1874], 26th June 1985; & JP-A-60 029 710 (ALPS DENKI) 15-02-1985, & JP60029710 A 00000000 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 9, no. 44 (P-365)[1867], 19th June 1985; & JP-A-60 024 505 (HITACHI SEISAKUSHO) 07-02-1985, & JP60024505 A 00000000 | Examination | US4212512 |