EP0361752 - Selective solder formation on printed circuit boards [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.07.1995 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 06.09.1995 [1995/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AT&T Corp. 32 Avenue of the Americas New York, NY 10013-2412 / US | [1990/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Durnwirth, Roy Karl, Jr. 5821 Harbour Hill Place Midlothian Virginia 231122 / US | 02 /
George, John Emanuel 5805 Tivolli Court Richmond Virginia 23227 / US | 03 /
Morton, Kim Leslie 3609 Brook Road Richmond Virginia 23227 / US | [1990/14] | Representative(s) | Johnston, Kenneth Graham, et al Lucent Technologies EUR-IP UK Ltd Unit 18, Core 3 Workzone Innova Business Park Electric Avenue Enfield, EN3 7XB / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1990/14] | Johnston, Kenneth Graham, et al AT&T (UK) LTD. AT&T Intellectual Property Division 5 Mornington Road Woodford Green Essex, IG8 OTU / GB | Application number, filing date | 89309479.7 | 19.09.1989 | [1990/14] | Priority number, date | US19880249133 | 26.09.1988 Original published format: US 249133 | [1990/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0361752 | Date: | 04.04.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/14] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0361752 | Date: | 13.06.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0361752 | Date: | 14.09.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.04.1990 | Classification | IPC: | H05K3/34, H05K3/24 | [1990/22] | CPC: |
H05K3/3473 (EP,US);
H05K3/062 (EP,US);
H05K3/3452 (EP,US);
H05K2201/099 (EP,US);
H05K2203/0361 (EP,US);
H05K2203/043 (EP,US);
H05K3/108 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [1990/14] | H05K3/34 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [1990/14] | Title | German: | Selektive Lötmetallbildung auf Leiterplatten | [1990/14] | English: | Selective solder formation on printed circuit boards | [1990/14] | French: | Formation sélective de soudure sur des panneaux de circuits imprimés | [1990/14] | Examination procedure | 04.12.1990 | Examination requested [1991/05] | 09.10.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.02.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.09.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 21.01.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 31.01.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.04.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 08.04.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.06.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.09.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.09.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.09.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US3926699 (DIXON CHARLES H); | [X]GB2087157 (QUASSIA ELECTRONICS LTD); | [X]US4487828 (HLADOVCAK RAYMOND C [US], et al); | [X]EP0252399 (DEUTSCHE TELEPHONWERK KABEL [DE]) | [Y] - METALLOBERFLAECHE, vol. 40, no. 11, November 1986, pages 465-470, München, DE; KORSTEN: "Fotosensible Lötmasken in der Leiterplattenfertigung" | [A] - CIRCUIT WORLD, vol. 4, no. 4, April 1978, pages 24-27, GB; AXON et al.: "Achieving optimum performance with UV curable solder masks" | [A] - SOLID STATE TECHNOLOGY, vol. 29, no. 6, June 1986, pages 153-157, Port Washington, NY, US; WOPSCHALL: "Dry film photoresists" |