EP0366259 - A process for interconnecting thin-film electrical circuits [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.03.1995 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.03.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 19.04.1995 [1995/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation New Orchard Road Armonk, NY 10504 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1990/18] | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation Old Orchard Road Armonk, N.Y. 10504 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Baum, Thomas Hall 4346 Glenmont Drive San Jose California 95136 / US | 02 /
Comita, Paul Brian 350 Hermosa Way Menlo Park California 94025 / US | 03 /
Jackson, Robert Lloyd 981 Shadow Brook Drive San Jose California 95120 / US | [1990/18] | Representative(s) | Burt, Roger James, et al IBM United Kingdom Limited Intellectual Property Department Hursley Park Winchester Hampshire SO21 2JN / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1993/12] | Burt, Roger James, Dr., et al IBM United Kingdom Limited Intellectual Property Department Hursley Park Winchester Hampshire SO21 2JN / GB | ||
Former [1990/21] | Johansson, Lars E. IBM Svenska AB Intellectual Property Department 4-01 S-163 92 Stockholm / SE | ||
Former [1990/18] | Johansson, Lars E. Bergenstrahle & Lindvall, P.O. Box 17704 S-118 93 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 89309601.6 | 21.09.1989 | [1990/18] | Priority number, date | US19880263103 | 26.10.1988 Original published format: US 263103 | [1990/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0366259 | Date: | 02.05.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/18] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0366259 | Date: | 22.11.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0366259 | Date: | 27.04.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.10.1990 | Classification | IPC: | H05K3/22, B23K26/00 | [1990/18] | CPC: |
H05K3/225 (EP,US);
H01L21/707 (EP,US);
H05K3/467 (EP,US);
H05K2201/0317 (EP,US);
H05K2203/0361 (EP,US);
H05K2203/107 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1990/18] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Untereinanderverbinden von elektrischen Dünnschichtkreisen | [1990/18] | English: | A process for interconnecting thin-film electrical circuits | [1990/18] | French: | Procédé pour interconnecter des circuits électriques à film mince | [1990/18] | Examination procedure | 20.08.1990 | Examination requested [1990/41] | 05.11.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.02.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.07.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 14.10.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.10.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 27.10.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.01.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.11.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.09.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.1992 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   19.11.1992 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0130398 (SIEMENS AG [DE]); | [A]US2704728 (PETER PAWLYK); | [A]US4044222 (KESTENBAUM AMI) | [A] - INTERNATIONAL ELECTRON DEVICES MEETING, Washington, Dec. 1-4, 1985, PROC. 1985, IEEE, Washington, US pages 594 - 597; CACOURIS ET. AL.: "Laser direct writing of metal interconnects" | [A] - APPLIED PHYSICS LETTERS. vol. 50, no. 15, 13 April 1987, NEW YORK US pages 1016 - 1018; BLACK ET. AL.: "Supplemental multilevel interconnects by laser direct writing: Applicationto GaAs digital integrated circuits" | [A] - RESEARCH DISCLOSURE. no. 292, August 1988, NEW YORK, NY, US, page 617 , No. 29267: "Laser ablation of thin chromium layer" | [A] - JOURNAL OF THE ELECTROCHEMICAL SOCIETY. vol. 134, no. 10, October 1987, MANCHESTER, NEW HAMP pages 2616 - 2619; BAUM: "Laser chemical vapor deposition of gold" |