EP0361833 - Load commutated invertor (LCI) induction motor drive [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 02.07.1992 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.07.1992 | Withdrawal of application | published on 19.08.1992 [1992/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORPORATION Westinghouse Building, Gateway Center Pittsburgh Pennsylvania 15222 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1990/14] | For all designated states WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORPORATION Westinghouse Building Gateway Center Pittsburgh Pennsylvania 15222 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Abbondanti, Alberto 9 Shangri-La Circle Pittsburgh, PA 15239 / US | [1990/14] | Representative(s) | Van Berlyn, Ronald Gilbert 30 The Green Calne Wiltshire SN11 8DJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1990/14] | van Berlyn, Ronald Gilbert 23, Centre Heights London NW3 6JG / GB | Application number, filing date | 89309734.5 | 25.09.1989 | [1990/14] | Priority number, date | US19880249524 | 26.09.1988 Original published format: US 249524 | [1990/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0361833 | Date: | 04.04.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/14] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0361833 | Date: | 30.10.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.09.1991 | Classification | IPC: | H02P7/63, H02P7/628, H02P5/408 | [1991/44] | CPC: |
H02P27/06 (EP,US);
H02P21/22 (EP,US);
H02P21/00 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1990/14] | H02P7/63 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1990/14] | Title | German: | Induktionsmotorenantrieb mit lastgeführtem Wechselrichter (LCI) | [1990/14] | English: | Load commutated invertor (LCI) induction motor drive | [1990/14] | French: | Moteur d'actionnement à induction avec onduleur à commutation par la charge (LCI) | [1990/14] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 23.04.1992 | Examination requested [1992/25] | 23.06.1992 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1992/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.09.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE3021004 (LICENTIA GMBH [DE]); | [A]US4330741 (NAGASE HIROSHI, et al) | [XP] - CONFERENCE RECORD OF THE 1988 IEEE INDUSTRY APPLICATIONS. SOCIETY ANNUAL MEETING, PART I, Pittsburgh, PA, 2nd - 7th October 1988, pages 302-307; P.M. ESPELAGE et al.: "Symmetrical GTO current source inverter for wide speed range control of 2300 to 4160 volt, 350 to 7000 HP, induction motors" |